GREGORY SILVER v. TEK-COLLECT, INC.
Plaintiff: GREGORY SILVER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF JASON CHEW and GREGORY SILVER
Defendant: TEK-COLLECT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01788
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within sixty days of this date, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/5/2020.(SWM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by GREGORY SILVER. TEK-COLLECT, INC. served on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TEK-COLLECT, INC.. (AKH)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff GREGORY SILVER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF JASON CHEW. (Steinkamp, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against TEK-COLLECT, INC., filed by GREGORY SILVER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF JASON CHEW. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6060041) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The January 31, 2020, and February 3, 2020, letters sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's March 18, 2020, Experian credit report, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREGORY SILVER v. TEK-COLLECT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY SILVER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF JASON CHEW
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY SILVER
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEK-COLLECT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?