LAMPKINS v. REEVES
Petitioner: KELVIN L. LAMPKINS
Respondent: ANGELA REEVES
Case Number: 1:2020cv01821
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (State Conviction) - KELVIN L. LAMPKINS's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges the petitioner's conviction and sentence in Indiana state court case number 18C01-1410-F2-01. Respondent is ORDERED to enter an appearance by 9/14/20. If respondent argues that all claims in the petition are subject to one of the procedural bars for dismissal outlined in Rule 5(b), respondent is ORDERED to file a motion to dismiss based on a complete procedural bar by 10/14/20. If Track 1 does not apply, respondent is ORDERED to answer the petition by 11/4/20. The Court does not anticipate extending respondent's deadlines absent respondent specifically setting forth extraordinary circumstances (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION AND DEADLINES). Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/4/2020.(NAD)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE, re #3 Order to Show Cause, filed by Petitioner KELVIN L. LAMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Directing Petitioner to Show Cause; Petitioner Kelvin L. Lampkins, an inmate in the Indiana Department of Correction, filed this 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition challenging his sentence in Indiana state court case number 18C01-1410- F2-01. A federal court may not consider a petition for a writ of habeas corpus from someone in custody pursuant to a state court judgment unless the petition alleges that the "custody [is] in violation of the Constitution or laws or treaties of the United States. Mr. Lampkins shall have through September 10, 2020, to show cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Failure to meet this deadline may result in dismissal without further notice. Show Cause Response due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/4/2020. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KELVIN L. LAMPKINS. Receipt No. IP069879 for $5.00 filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Motion to Correct Erroneous Sentence; Order from Indiana Court of Appeals). (AKH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2020: #2 Envelope) (AKH). Modified on 7/8/2020 (main document replaced) (DJH). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/8/2020, Receipt) (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAMPKINS v. REEVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KELVIN L. LAMPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ANGELA REEVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?