RIGGS et al v. HIRELEVEL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TAMIKA RIGGS and AWMIA RIGGS
Defendant: EMILY PERKS, AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC. and KAREN KAYLYN
Case Number: 1:2020cv01826
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC., KAREN KAYLYN, EMILY PERKS . (Taft, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, filed by AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC., KAREN KAYLYN, EMILY PERKS.(Taft, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [PARTIAL] , filed by Defendants AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC., KAREN KAYLYN, EMILY PERKS. (Taft, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [PARTIAL], filed by Defendants AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC., KAREN KAYLYN, EMILY PERKS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Taft, Melissa)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2020 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/3/2020.(SWM)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC., KAREN KAYLYN, EMILY PERKS. (Taft, Melissa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIRELEVEL, INC.. (Taft, Melissa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendants AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC., KAREN KAYLYN, EMILY PERKS. (Mohler, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa K. Taft on behalf of Defendants AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC., KAREN KAYLYN, EMILY PERKS. (Taft, Melissa)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AMANDA COVERT, HIRELEVEL, INC., KAREN KAYLYN, EMILY PERKS. (JRB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Waterfill on behalf of Plaintiff Awmia Riggs. (Waterfill, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Waterfill on behalf of Plaintiff Tamika Riggs. (Waterfill, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6066019) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Waterfill, Mark) Modified on 7/8/2020 (JD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIGGS et al v. HIRELEVEL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY PERKS
Represented By: Melissa K. Taft
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA COVERT
Represented By: Melissa K. Taft
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIRELEVEL, INC.
Represented By: Melissa K. Taft
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN KAYLYN
Represented By: Melissa K. Taft
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMIKA RIGGS
Represented By: Mark R. Waterfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AWMIA RIGGS
Represented By: Mark R. Waterfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?