STRANGE v. BALKAMP, INC.
Plaintiff: JOHN STRANGE
Defendant: BALKAMP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01837
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2020 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/1/2020.(SWM) Modified on 9/2/2020 (SWM).
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BALKAMP, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Geunine Parts Company for BALKAMP, INC... (Hoffman, Benjamin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to BALKAMP, INC.. (RAGS) (DWH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari H. Halbrook on behalf of Defendant BALKAMP, INC.. (Halbrook, Kari)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BALKAMP, INC.. (Hoffman, Benjamin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Charles Hoffman on behalf of Defendant BALKAMP, INC.. (Hoffman, Benjamin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by JOHN STRANGE. BALKAMP, INC. served on 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cummings, Paul)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BALKAMP, INC.. (AKH)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN STRANGE. (Cummings, Paul)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against BALKAMP, INC., filed by JOHN STRANGE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6067742) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRANGE v. BALKAMP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN STRANGE
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALKAMP, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Kari H. Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?