MONTGOMERY v. TYLER TRUSS SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY
Defendant: TYLER TRUSS SYSTEMS, INC. and TYLER TRUSS LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01894
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2020 Filing 14 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY. (Kondras, Robert)
September 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY. (Kondras, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint , filed by TYLER TRUSS LLC, TYLER TRUSS SYSTEMS, INC..(Lewis, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TYLER TRUSS LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tyler Truss LLC for TYLER TRUSS LLC.. (Lewis, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Lewis on behalf of Defendant TYLER TRUSS LLC. (Lewis, John)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY. TYLER TRUSS LLC served on 8/10/2020. (Kondras, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons (Alias - Amended) as to TYLER TRUSS LLC. (CKM)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to TYLER TRUSS LLC. (RAGS) (CKM)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to TYLER TRUSS LLC. (Kondras, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against TYLER TRUSS LLC. filed by DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY.(Kondras, Robert) Modified on 7/24/2020 (CKM).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TYLER TRUSS SYSTEMS, INC. (REO)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY. (Kondras, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TYLER TRUSS SYSTEMS, INC., filed by DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6080536) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTGOMERY v. TYLER TRUSS SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA A. MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER TRUSS SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: John H. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER TRUSS LLC
Represented By: John H. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?