FLOYD v. ZAPP
Plaintiff: ERIC TYLER FLOYD
Defendant: ALONZOE ZAPP doing business as CUTTING EDGE LAWN CARE
Case Number: 1:2020cv01895
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/27/2020.(SWM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ALONZOE ZAPP. (Wiley, Craig)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALONZOE ZAPP. (Wiley, Craig)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendant ALONZOE ZAPP. (Mohler, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Wiley on behalf of Defendant ALONZOE ZAPP. (Wiley, Craig)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by ERIC TYLER FLOYD. ALONZOE ZAPP served on 8/8/2020. (Haskin, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. (JDH)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ALONZOE ZAPP. (AKH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Logan on behalf of Plaintiff ERIC TYLER FLOYD. (Logan, Paul)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff ERIC TYLER FLOYD. (Haskin, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ALONZOE ZAPP, filed by ERIC TYLER FLOYD. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6080941) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLOYD v. ZAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALONZOE ZAPP doing business as CUTTING EDGE LAWN CARE
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Represented By: Craig W. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC TYLER FLOYD
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Represented By: Paul Anthony Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?