CAMPBELL v. NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: CURTIS CAMPBELL
Defendant: NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01896
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 04:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/11/2020.(SWM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL . (Adams, Samuel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION.(DeWeese, Kathryn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Elizabeth DeWeese on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (DeWeese, Kathryn)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Whitlatch, James) Modified on 8/6/2020 - edited docket text to match title of document (NAD).
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Zebulun Mountains, Inc. for NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION.. (Whitlatch, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Matthew Heeb on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Heeb, Ryan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Whitlatch on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Whitlatch, James)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by CURTIS CAMPBELL. NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION served on 7/29/2020. (Haskin, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. (JDH)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (AKH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Mark Adams on behalf of Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Adams, Samuel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Haskin, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION, filed by CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6081007) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL v. NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS CAMPBELL
Represented By: Samuel Mark Adams
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Heeb
Represented By: James L. Whitlatch
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth DeWeese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?