BRUMATE, LLC v. FROST BUDDY LLC
Plaintiff: Brumate, LLC
Defendant: Frost Buddy LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01981
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Complaint, filed by Defendant FROST BUDDY LLC (Hedges, Norman)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FROST BUDDY LLC. (Hedges, Norman)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman J. Hedges on behalf of Defendant FROST BUDDY LLC. (Hedges, Norman)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Frost Buddy LLC c/o Mitch Mammoser, Registered Agent on August 11, 2020, filed by BRUMATE, LLC. (Stohry, Bradley)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 07/29/2020) (JDH)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FROST BUDDY LLC. (REO)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brumate, LLC. (Stohry, Bradley)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley M. Stohry on behalf of Plaintiff Brumate, LLC. (Stohry, Bradley)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brumate, LLC, filed by Brumate, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6103617) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Stohry, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRUMATE, LLC v. FROST BUDDY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brumate, LLC
Represented By: Bradley M. Stohry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frost Buddy LLC
Represented By: Norman J. Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?