MCLEAN v. PFIZER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PENNY MCLEAN
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PARKE, DAVIS & CO., WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC, PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC and f
Case Number: 1:2020cv02164
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine D. Althoff on behalf of Defendants PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC. (Althoff, Katherine)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC. (Emley, Allyson)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC. (Emley, Allyson)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC. (Emley, Allyson)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson E. Emley on behalf of Defendants PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC, PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA LLC, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC. (Emley, Allyson)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PFIZER, INC., Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC as successor-in-interest of PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY, WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC f/k/a WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, filed by PENNY MCLEAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Parke, Davis & Company LLC, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Pharmacia LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Warner Lambert Company LLC)(Kassan, Randi)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James Patrick Hanlon. Judge James R. Sweeney II is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-02164-JPH-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/19/2020. (BRR)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC. (Kassan, Randi)
August 18, 2020 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered a summons that is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(C), which requires a summons to state the name and address of the attorney of plaintiff... Plaintiff has tendered a summons without the contact information for counsel of record. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit properly completed summons for issuance. (BRR)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PARKE, DAVIS & CO., PFIZER, INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC, filed by PENNY MCLEAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6133178) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCLEAN v. PFIZER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: Katherine D. Althoff
Represented By: Allyson E. Emley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKE, DAVIS & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA LLC
Represented By: Katherine D. Althoff
Represented By: Allyson E. Emley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Katherine D. Althoff
Represented By: Allyson E. Emley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKE, DAVIS & COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Katherine D. Althoff
Represented By: Allyson E. Emley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f
Represented By: Katherine D. Althoff
Represented By: Allyson E. Emley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNY MCLEAN
Represented By: Randi Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?