GIBSON v. PRICE et al
Plaintiff: LIONEL GIBSON
Defendant: ADAM G. FORREST, THE GEO GROUP and ANGIE PRICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02169
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - Plaintiff Lionel Gibson's motion for an extension of time, dkt. [ #8 ], is granted. He shall have through November 25, 2020, to show cause why this action should not be dismissed as directed in the Order of August 24, 2020. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/14/2020. (SWM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time for 30 days up to and including October 25, 2020, filed by Plaintiff LIONEL GIBSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Mr. Gibson's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. He shall have through September 25, 2020, to pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.00. Mr. Gibson's complaint is dismissed. He shall have through September 25, 2020, to show cause why judgment dismissing his due process claims for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and dismissing his state law claims for lack of jurisdiction should not issue. Consistent with the dismissal of the complaint Mr. Gibson's motion for preliminary injunction, dkt. #3 , is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/24/2020. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (JD)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Lionel Gibson re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by LIONEL GIBSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff LIONEL GIBSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #2 Exhibit) (AKH).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LIONEL GIBSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Inmate Trust Fund Account; IDOC Transaction History Report, #2 Envelope).(AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADAM G. FORREST, ANGIE PRICE, THE GEO GROUP, filed by LIONEL GIBSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIBSON v. PRICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM G. FORREST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GEO GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGIE PRICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIONEL GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?