KEY v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff: SEAN KEY
Defendant: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02170
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Remark - The Southern District of Indiana receives email notice from the Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois regarding electronic case transfer. This case was received electronically by the Northern District of Illinois on 9/24/2020 and was assigned case number 1:20-cv-05595 in the receiving court. (MAC)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on September 21, 2020. (MAC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order # 31. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter). (MAC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (REO)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Raizner on behalf of Plaintiff SEAN KEY. (Raizner, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by SEAN KEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6134162) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Raizner, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/18/2020 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEY v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN KEY
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Raizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?