LINSMEYER v. VDS RACING ENGINES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BRUCE LINSMEYER
Defendant: CHARLES CORNELISON and VDS RACING ENGINES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02173
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Acknowledges Plaintiff's Notice Dismissal; This action is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/31/2020. marginal notation (CKM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff BRUCE LINSMEYER. (Hannon, Edward)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 05:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The purpose of the conference is to discuss a schedule regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief to Preserve Collateral. [Dkt. #3 ]. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants, either in person or by counsel if represented, shall appear by telephone. The parties shall attend the conference by calling 877- 873-8017, Access Code 7786882, Security Code 202173. Counsel for Plaintiff is hereby ordered to serve a copy of this order on Defendant Charles Cornelison, and shall file proof of such service on or before August 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/25/2020.(SWM)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CHARLES CORNELISON, VDS RACING ENGINES, INC. (REO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Youngs on behalf of Plaintiff BRUCE LINSMEYER. (Youngs, Graham)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRUCE LINSMEYER. (Hannon, Edward)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief to Preserve Collateral, filed by Plaintiff BRUCE LINSMEYER. (Hannon, Edward)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward R. Hannon on behalf of Plaintiff BRUCE LINSMEYER. (Hannon, Edward)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Promissory Note; To Foreclose Security Agreement and Take Possession of Collateral; To Void Invalid Promissory Note and Security Agreement and for Declaration that Financing Statement was Filed Fraudulently against All Defendants, filed by BRUCE LINSMEYER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6136368) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - VDS SOS Filings, #2 Exhibit 2 - VDS Terms of Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Transfer of Voting Trust, #4 Exhibit 4 - Minutes of Special Meeting, #5 Exhibit 5 - Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit 6 - Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Receipts, #8 Exhibit 8 - Additional documentation of funds used, #9 Exhibit 9 - Security Agree Addendum-Cash Flow-Amortization, #10 Exhibit 10 - Payment History, #11 Exhibit 11 - Cornelison Promissory Note, #12 Exhibit 12 - Cornelison Security Agreement, #13 Exhibit 13 - Cornelison Financing Statement, #14 Exhibit 14 - Loan Amortization Schedule, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Proposed Summons)(Hannon, Edward) Modified on 8/20/2020 (CKM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINSMEYER v. VDS RACING ENGINES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES CORNELISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VDS RACING ENGINES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE LINSMEYER
Represented By: Graham Youngs
Represented By: Edward R. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?