PERKINS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: LINDA L. PERKINS
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2020cv02175
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Defendant is granted an enlargement of time, until December 18, 2020, to file Defendant's Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/14/2020. (NAD)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18, 2020 , filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Han, Lu)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lu Han on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Han, Lu)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Filing #2 , is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/24/2020. (CKM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore F. Smith, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff LINDA L. PERKINS. (Smith, Theodore)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff LINDA L. PERKINS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Theodore)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by LINDA L. PERKINS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERKINS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Lu Han
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA L. PERKINS
Represented By: Theodore F. Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?