WATSON v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Charles Watson, Jr.
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, U.S. BANK, N.A. and NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC doing business as MR. COOPER
Case Number: 1:2020cv02178
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC served on 10/5/2020. (Flick, Brian)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR. U.S. BANK, N.A. served on 10/5/2020. (Flick, Brian)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Seal Document. Document 1-1 is hereby sealed and the Clerk is directed to seal Document 1-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/24/2020. (SWM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 REDACTION to #1 Complaint Exhibit 1/Document 1-1 by ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR. (Flick, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint Document 1-1 only, filed by Plaintiff ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flick, Brian)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, U.S. BANK, N.A. (REO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, U.S. BANK, N.A., filed by Ernest Charles Watson, Jr.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6137858) (Attachments: # *** SEALED PER DKT. #6 *** (1) Exhibit 1-Loan, #2 Exhibit 2-Bankruptcy Docket, #3 Exhibit 3-Notice of Final Cure, #4 Exhibit 4-Response to Final Cure, #5 Exhibit 5-Bankruptcy Contempt Order, #6 Exhibit 6-Notice of Error, #7 Exhibit 7-Response to Notice of Error, #8 Exhibit 8-NOE and RFI Mr. Cooper, #9 Exhibit 9-Mr. Cooper Response, #10 Exhibit 10-Mr. Cooper Notice Past Due, #11 Exhibit 11-Mortgage Statements, #12 Exhibit 12-Consumer Narratives, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons Nationstar, #15 Proposed Summons U.S. Bank, N.A.)(Flick, Brian) Modified on 8/24/2020 (SWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATSON v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Charles Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Daniel Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC doing business as MR. COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?