K.H. v. BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: K. H.
Defendant: BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02215
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Billingsley, Jessica)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/1/2020. (SWM)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Borg, Brent)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Billingsley on behalf of Defendant BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Billingsley, Jessica)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Anthony Manna on behalf of Defendant BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Manna, Andrew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent R. Borg on behalf of Defendant BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Borg, Brent)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Marie Michael on behalf of Plaintiff K. H.. (Michael, Catherine)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED Plaintiff's Notice of Intention to Seek Leave to Proceed Anonymously, filed by Plaintiff K. H.. (Blessing, Thomas)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Anonymously, filed by Plaintiff K. H.. (Blessing, Thomas)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (AKH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Blessing on behalf of Plaintiff K. H.. (Blessing, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Attorney Fees against BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6145125) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Redacted DP I, #2 Exhibit B- Redacted DP II, #3 Exhibit C- Amended Issues, #4 Exhibit D- Agreed Entry, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Blessing, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.H. v. BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. H.
Represented By: Thomas W. Blessing
Represented By: Catherine Marie Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew Anthony Manna
Represented By: Brent R. Borg
Represented By: Jessica L. Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?