MAPES v. FOSTER
Plaintiff: ERIC J. MAPES
Defendant: MONICA FOSTER
Case Number: 1:2020cv02230
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF Citizen's Arrest, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES (NAD)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - denying #14 Motion to Reconsider. Mapes has presented no legal bases to show that reconsideration is appropriate or merited. His Motion does not address his failure to establish federal jurisdiction for his claims. Because he points to no manifest error, or misapplication of, or failure to recognize, controlling precedent in the Court's September 29, 2020 Order, the Motion to Reconsider, Dkt. #14 is DENIED. (See ORDER.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/7/2020. (NAD)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as undeliverable (Return to Sender; No Postage). #10 Order on Motion sent to ERIC J. MAPES. (NAD)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re #13 Closed Judgment, #12 Entry, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (NAD)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO. 58 - The Court having this day made its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The action is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/28/2020.(NAD)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENTRY DISMISSING ACTION AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - Because the Plaintiff has failed to cure the deficiencies of his initial Complaint, for the reasons discussed in the screening Entry, this action is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Final judgment consistent with this Entry will be issued under separate order. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/28/2020.(NAD)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MONICA FOSTER, filed by ERIC J. MAPES.(NAD)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MARGINAL ENTRY RE #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse. The motion is denied for the same reason's explained on September 11, 2020, dkt #8 . Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/21/2020. (NAD)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Recuse, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (NAD)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY - DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #6 MOTION TO RECUSE. Mapes' dissatisfaction with prior orders from the undersigned Judge is not evidence of bias nor is it otherwise a valid basis for a change of judge. Having failed to satisfy the legal standard for obtaining a change of judge, Mapes' Motion to Recuse (Filing No. #6 ) is DENIED. Copy to Defendant via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/11/2020. (NAD)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #4 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. For the reasons stated above, Mapes' Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee (Filing No. #4 ) is GRANTED. Having screened the Complaint, the Court finds it is subject to dismissal for lack of jurisdiction. Mapes is granted leave to file an amended complaint by no later than Friday, October 16, 2020. If no amended complaint is filed by that date, this action will be dismissed for the reasons set forth above. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/11/2020. (NAD)
September 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Recuse, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (NAD)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 SEALED Affidavit in Support and Motion to Amend re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Report dated 9/28/19, #2 Exhibit Medical Report dated 10/17/19, #3 Exhibit Medical Report dated 6/26/20, #4 Exhibit Medical article)(NAD)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (NAD)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Pro se Plaintiff Eric J. Mapes filed a Petitioners Notice of Complaint and Complaint on August 25, 2020 (Filing No. #1 ). Plaintiff failed to pay the filing fee or alternatively file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee to the clerk of the district court or submit the necessary motion to proceed in forma pauperis no later than September 30, 2020, or this action will be dismissed and final judgment entered without further notice. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of the form Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee to Plaintiff with this Order. (Attachments: #1 Blank Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee) (NAD) Modified on 9/3/2020 - copy to plaintiff via US Mail (NAD).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONICA FOSTER, filed by ERIC J. MAPES. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAPES v. FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONICA FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC J. MAPES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?