YOUNG v. GEO GOUP INC. et al
Plaintiff: OTIS YOUNG, JR.
Defendant: NEAL FETZ, TEMPLE, GEO GOUP INC., WINNINGHAM, CABREA, JENNIFER SMITH and KEITH BUTTS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02328
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff OTIS YOUNG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff OTIS YOUNG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Receipt of Payment, filed by Plaintiff OTIS YOUNG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIPT #IP071039 for partial filing fee in the amount of $41.10, paid by OTIS YOUNG, JR.. (DJH)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Forty-One Dollars and Ten Cents ($41.10). The plaintiff shall have through October 16, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/17/2020. (NAD)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to the Court, filed by Plaintiff OTIS YOUNG, JR, re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AKH)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff OTIS YOUNG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IDOC All Transaction Report, #2 Envelope). (AKH)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEITH BUTTS, CABREA, NEAL FETZ, GEO GOUP INC., JENNIFER SMITH, TEMPLE, WINNINGHAM, filed by OTIS YOUNG, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. GEO GOUP INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEAL FETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO GOUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CABREA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OTIS YOUNG, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?