AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC v. JL CUSTOMS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC
Defendant: JL CUSTOMS, LLC, LARRY ROSE and JUSTIN LYON
Case Number: 1:2020cv02358
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Lowry, Joshua)
November 2, 2020 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC . (Rykovich, Brittney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC. LARRY ROSE served on 9/21/2020. (Rykovich, Brittney)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2020 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/30/2020.(SWM)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Parties' #11 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time - On or before November 4, 2020, the Defendants JL Customs, LLC and Larry Rose shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. No further enlargement of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/30/2020. (SWM)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Robert Lowry on behalf of Defendants JL CUSTOMS, LLC, JUSTIN LYON, LARRY ROSE. (Lowry, Joshua)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline E. Richardson on behalf of Defendants JL CUSTOMS, LLC, JUSTIN LYON, LARRY ROSE. (Richardson, Caroline)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JL CUSTOMS, LLC. (Paganelli, Fred)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/04/2020 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants JL CUSTOMS, LLC, LARRY ROSE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paganelli, Fred)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Anthony Paganelli on behalf of Defendants JL CUSTOMS, LLC, JUSTIN LYON, LARRY ROSE. (Paganelli, Fred)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Justin Lyons' #8 Motion for Extension of Time - Defendant Justin Lyons shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 4, 2020. No further enlargement of this deadline is anticipated. To the extent Mr. Lyons purports to seek an enlargement of time to respond to the Complaint on behalf of Defendant JL Customs, LLC, that motion is hereby STRICKEN. As a corporate entity, JL Customs, LLC must be represented by counsel. Nocula v. UGS Corp., 520 F.3d 719, 725 (7th Cir. 2008). Mr. Lyons has not entered an appearance in this matter as counsel for JL Customs, LLC; accordingly, Mr. Lyons may not file motions on behalf of JL Customs, LLC. Copy to Justin Lyon via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/21/2020. (SWM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to in which to respond to #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant JUSTIN LYON. (NAD)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Appearance of Counsel served on Justin Lyon on September 13, 2020, filed by AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC. (Rykovich, Brittney)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Appearance of Counsel served on JL Customs, LLC on September 13, 2020, filed by AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC. (Rykovich, Brittney)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to JL CUSTOMS, LLC, JUSTIN LYON, and LARRY ROSE. (DJH)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC for AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC.. (Rykovich, Brittney)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney B. Rykovich on behalf of Plaintiff AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC. (Rykovich, Brittney)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JL CUSTOMS, LLC, JUSTIN LYON, LARRY ROSE, filed by AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6173820) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons JL Customs, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Justin Lyon, #4 Larry Rose)(Rykovich, Brittney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC v. JL CUSTOMS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL CUSTOMS, LLC
Represented By: Caroline E. Richardson
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Represented By: Joshua Robert Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY ROSE
Represented By: Caroline E. Richardson
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Represented By: Joshua Robert Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN LYON
Represented By: Caroline E. Richardson
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Represented By: Joshua Robert Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTO TRUCK KARGO EQUIPMENT, LLC
Represented By: Brittney B. Rykovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?