EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. RANRAE, INC.
Plaintiff: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Defendant: Ranrae, Inc. and RANRAE, INC. doing business as SUBWAY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02450
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RANRAE, INC.. RANRAE, INC. waiver sent on 9/23/2020. (Mahony, Marcia)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia A. Mahony on behalf of Defendant RANRAE, INC.. (Mahony, Marcia)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDH)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RANRAE, INC.. (AKH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Dean Edmonds on behalf of Plaintiff EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Edmonds, Nancy)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin M. Lybolt on behalf of Plaintiff EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Lybolt, Robin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ranrae, Inc., filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Lybolt, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. RANRAE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: Robin M. Lybolt
Represented By: Nancy Dean Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranrae, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANRAE, INC. doing business as SUBWAY
Represented By: Marcia A. Mahony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?