GENG v. SPENCER
Plaintiff: JIAYI GENG
Defendant: RICHARD V. SPENCER
Case Number: 1:2020cv02458
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as undeliverable, return to sender, no longer there. (720 Kennon St, SE rm 233, Washington Navy Yard, DC 20374) #6 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint sent to RICHARD V. SPENCER. (JDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to: Richard V. Spencer (RAGS) (JDC)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without pre-payment of the filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fee. The filing fee for in forma pauperis litigants is $350. See USDC Fee Schedule at https://www.insd.uscourts.gov/fees-financial-information (stating that the $400 filing fee includes a $50 administrative fee, but that fee "does not apply to... persons granted in forma pauperis status under 28 U.S.C. 1915"). Immediate payment is not required, but the $350 balance remains owing. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3) requires the Court to order service for Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Clerk is designated pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) to issue process to the defendant, Secretary Spencer, in the manner specified by Rule 4 (i). Process shall consist of the complaint (ECF No. 1), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 9/30/2020. (JDC)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Submission of Final Agency Decision. (JDC)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JIAYI GENG. (REO)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD V. SPENCER, filed by JIAYI GENG. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENG v. SPENCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIAYI GENG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD V. SPENCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?