GRAY et al v. SPEEDWAY LLC
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE GRAY and NATHAN GRAY
Defendant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02480
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. THIS MATTER IS SET FOR A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AT 1:30 P.M. ON SEPTEMBER 7, 2021, BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIM A. BAKER, ROOM 234, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 46 E. OHIO STREET, INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE MUST HAVE PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. THIS MATTER IS SET FOR A JURY TRIAL AT 9:30 A.M. ON SEPTEMBER 13, 2021, BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIM A. BAKER, ROOM 238, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 46 E. OHIO STREET, INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA. THIS TRIAL IS ANTICIPATED TO LAST THREE DAYS. Discovery due by 8/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/23/2020.(NAD)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE - Based upon the written consent of the parties [Dkt No. 13], this case is now referred to the currently assigned United States Magistrate Tim A. Baker to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Should this case be reassigned to a magistrate judge other than the magistrate judge assigned on the date of this order, any party or attorney of record may object within 30 days of such reassignment. If no objection is filed, the consent will remain in effect. The cause number of this action shall be amended as shown above to reflect the referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge. Please use altered case number 1:20-cv-2480-TAB-JRS on all future filings with this court. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/30/2020. (JDC)
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Ladendorf, Lance)
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs NATHAN GRAY, STEPHANIE GRAY . (Ladendorf, Lance)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 Statement Responding to Defendant's Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Ladendorf, Lance)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/26/2020.(SWM)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Pavlack on behalf of Plaintiffs NATHAN GRAY, STEPHANIE GRAY. (Pavlack, Eric)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin E. Flora on behalf of Plaintiffs NATHAN GRAY, STEPHANIE GRAY. (Flora, Colin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance R. Ladendorf on behalf of Plaintiffs NATHAN GRAY, STEPHANIE GRAY. (Ladendorf, Lance)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Record : State Court Docket Sheet; Complaint for Damages; Appearance on behalf of plaintiff; Subpoena/Summons; Service Returned Served; Appearance on behalf of defendant; Answer to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEEDWAY LLC identifying Corporate Parent MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MPC INVESTMENT LLC for SPEEDWAY LLC.. (Davis, Thomas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Davis on behalf of Defendant SPEEDWAY LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Howard Superior Court 4, case number 34D04-2005-CT-000968, filed by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6196828) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint for Damages, #2 State Court Record State Court Docket Sheet; Complaint for Damages; Appearance on behalf of plaintiffs; Subpoena/Summons; Service Returned Served; Appearance on behalf of defendants; Answer to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY et al v. SPEEDWAY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE GRAY
Represented By: Eric S. Pavlack
Represented By: Colin E. Flora
Represented By: Lance R. Ladendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN GRAY
Represented By: Eric S. Pavlack
Represented By: Colin E. Flora
Represented By: Lance R. Ladendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?