SCRUGGS v. KNIGHT et al
Plaintiff: ARLIN A. SCRUGGS
Defendant: A. SMITH, TY ROBBINS, PRETORIS, JACK HENDRIX, DEREK CHRISTIAN, HARTZEL, WILLIAM WILSON, K. MCKENZIE and STANLEY KNIGHT
Case Number: 1:2020cv02523
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension - He shall have through December 9, 2020, to pay the initial partial filing fee as directed in the Order of October 13, 2020. He continues to have through November 19, 2020, to show cause why this action should not be dismissed as directed in the Order of October 20, 2020. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/28/2020. (JRB) Modified on 10/28/2020 (JRB).
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiff ARLIN A. SCRUGGS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Dismissing Complaint and Directing Plaintiff to Show Cause - The complaint must be dismissed. Mr. Scruggs shall have through November 19, 2020, in which to show cause why Judgment consistent with this Entry should not issue. See Luevano v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., 722 F.3d 1014, 1022 (7th Cir. 2013) ("Without at least an opportunity to amend or to respond to an order to show cause, an IFP applicant's case could be tossed out of court without giving the applicant any timely notice or opportunity to be heard to clarify, contest, or simply request leave to amend."). Alternatively, Mr. Scruggs may file an amended complaint that states a viable claim for relief. Failure to do so by the deadline may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. SEE ORDER. Copy to Arlin A. Scruggs via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/20/2020.(JDH)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ARLIN A. SCRUGGS. (JDH)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ARLIN A. SCRUGGS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Twenty-Nine Dollars and Seventy-Seven Cents ($29.77). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through November 9, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. 28 U.S. C. 1915(b)(2). After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to the plaintiff and the plaintiff's custodian, and the Court will screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Copy to Arlin A. Scruggs via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/13/2020. (JDH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ARLIN A. SCRUGGS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency; Offender Trust System Transaction History Inquiry).(AKH)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEREK CHRISTIAN, HARTZEL, JACK HENDRIX, STANLEY KNIGHT, K. MCKENZIE, PRETORIS, TY ROBBINS, A. SMITH, WILLIAM WILSON, filed by ARLIN A. SCRUGGS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20).(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCRUGGS v. KNIGHT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TY ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRETORIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK HENDRIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK CHRISTIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARLIN A. SCRUGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?