KEEVER v. WARDEN
Petitioner: ANDREW A. KEEVER
Respondent: WARDEN
Case Number: 1:2020cv02670
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary)The petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is denied. The petitioner has sufficient funds to pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action. He has through November 16, 2020 in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the court The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted.( Show Cause Response due by 11/27/2020.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/16/2020. Copy Mailed.(CKM)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner, ANDREW A. KEEVER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ANDREW A. KEEVER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 disciplinary hearing appeal, #2 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEEVER v. WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANDREW A. KEEVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?