DELTA FAUCET COMPANY v. KOHLER CO.
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation and DELTA FAUCET COMPANY
Defendant: KOHLER CO.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02800
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
2 Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
3 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Martha Jahn Snyder to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6312828), filed by Defendant KOHLER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Martha Jahn Snyder, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kristin Graham Noel to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6312826), filed by Defendant KOHLER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Kristin Graham Noel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KOHLER CO.. (Fleming, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue (Declaration of Felma Degefa), filed by Defendant KOHLER CO.. (Fleming, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue , filed by Defendant KOHLER CO.. (Fleming, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue, filed by Defendant KOHLER CO.. (Fleming, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B. Fleming on behalf of Defendant KOHLER CO.. (Fleming, Joshua)
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Corrected Complaint; Notice of Related Cases; Order Reassigning Related Case and Notice of Reassignment served on Kohler Co. on 11/17/2020, filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Moustakas, George)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael Patrick Kella for DELTA FAUCET COMPANY added. Copy to Kella via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Patrick Kella to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6277327), filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification of Kella, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy and David P. Utykanski for DELTA FAUCET COMPANY added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy, and David P. Utykanski are ordered to register within ten days of the entry of this order. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/6/2020. (SWM)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy and David P. Utykanski to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $500, receipt number 0756-6262810), filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification Briggs, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Doerr, #3 Exhibit A-Certification of Dowdy, #4 Exhibit A- Certification of Moustakas, #5 Exhibit A- Certification of Utykanski, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt and Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Judge Sarah Evans Barker and Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-2800-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt and Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:20-cv-02796-TWP-MJD. Judge Sarah Evans Barker and Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/4/2020. (LDH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in Lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibits (CKM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to KOHLER CO. (REO)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Submission of Corrected Complaint, filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases, filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Swift on behalf of Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KOHLER CO., filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6250559) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Kohler store, #2 Exhibit B-'079 patent, #3 Exhibit C-Assignment of Masco, #4 Exhibit C-2 McGuire Assignment, #5 Exhibit C-3 Nelson Assignment, #6 Exhibit D-'702 patent, #7 Exhibit E-Nelson assignment of 16694487, #8 Exhibit F-'217 patent, #9 Exhibit G-Nelson assignment of 16694479, #10 Exhibit H-'079 claim chart, #11 Exhibit I- '702 claim chart, #12 Exhibit J-'217 claim chart, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons)(Swift, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY v. KOHLER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER CO.
Represented By: Joshua B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Represented By: Michael Patrick Kella
Represented By: Michael P. Doerr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dowdy
Represented By: David P. Utykanski
Represented By: George D. Moustakas
Represented By: Jewell Nile Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?