DELTA FAUCET COMPANY v. GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. et al
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation and DELTA FAUCET COMPANY
Defendant: GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC, DANZE, INC, Globe Union Industrial Corp and GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02802
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
3 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 UPS Confirmation of Delivery re #29 UPS Receipt (with tracking number 1Z 444 139 D9 9015 9643) of Court issued Service of Dkt #28 Summons and Dkt #13 Amended Complaint to Defendant GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. per Entry at dkt #27 . (NAD) (NAD)
December 18, 2020 Filing 29 UPS Receipt (with tracking number 1Z 444 139 D9 9015 9643) of Court issued Service of Dkt #28 Summons and Dkt #13 Amended Complaint to Defendant GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. per Entry at dkt #27 . (NAD)
December 17, 2020 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. (NAD)
December 17, 2020 Filing 27 ENTRY - Plaintiff, Delta Faucet Company, has filed a Request for Clerk to Proceed with Service Under FRCP 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) (Dkt. #25 ). The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Request to the extent it asks the Clerk to perform actions to effectuate Plaintiff's chosen method of service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f) (2)(C)(ii). The Clerk is directed to address and send the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. #13 ) and summons to Globe, at the address provided in Plaintiff's Request, using any form of mail that requires a signed receipt. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/17/2020. (NAD)
December 14, 2020 Filing 26 Submission of Proposed Order , re #25 MOTION Request for Clerk to Proceed with Service under FRCP 4(F)(2)(C)(ii), filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Swift, Michael)
December 11, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION Request for Clerk to Proceed with Service under FRCP 4(F)(2)(C)(ii), filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Swift, Michael)
December 10, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Yongyuan G. Rice to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6316949), filed by Defendants DANZE, INC, GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Yongyuan G. Rice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hensel, David)
December 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Erik R. Puknys to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6316897), filed by Defendants DANZE, INC, GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Erik R. Puknys, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hensel, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants DANZE, INC, GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC. (Hensel, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC identifying Corporate Parent GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. for GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC.. (Hensel, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANZE, INC identifying Corporate Parent GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. for DANZE, INC.. (Hensel, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hensel on behalf of Defendants DANZE, INC, GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC. (Hensel, David)
November 25, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint; Notice of Related Cases; Order Reassigning Case and Notice of Reassignment served on Danze, Inc. on 11/13/2020, filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Moustakas, George)
November 25, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint; Notice of Related Cases; Order Reassigning Case and Notice of Reassignment served on Gerber Plumbing Fixtures LLC on 11/18/2020, filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Moustakas, George)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael Patrick Kella for DELTA FAUCET COMPANY added. Copy to Kella via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Amended Complaint in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-Brands Archive, #3 Exhibit B-Patent, #4 Exhibit C-Assignment 16694487, #5 Exhibit D-Patent, #6 Exhibit E-Assignment 1664479, #7 Exhibit F-Gerber where to buy, #8 Exhibit G- Claim chart, #9 Exhibit H-Claim Chart) (NAD)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Patrick Kella to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6277337), filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification of Kella, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Michael)
November 11, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against DANZE, INC, GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC, GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP., filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Brands Archive, #2 Exhibit B-Patent, #3 Exhibit C-Assignment 16694487, #4 Exhibit D-Patent, #5 Exhibit E-Assignment 1664479, #6 Exhibit F-Gerber where to buy, #7 Exhibit G- Claim chart, #8 Exhibit H-Claim Chart, #9 Proposed Summons)(Swift, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy and David P. Utykanski for DELTA FAUCET COMPANY added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy, and David P. Utykanski are ordered to register within ten days of the entry of this order. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/6/2020. (SWM)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy and David P. Utykanski to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $500, receipt number 0756-6262885), filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification Briggs, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Doerr, #3 Exhibit A-Certification of Dowdy, #4 Exhibit A- Certification of Moustakas, #5 Exhibit A- Certification of Utykanski, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt and Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson and Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-2802-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt and Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:20-cv-02796-TWP-MJD. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson and Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/4/2020. (MRI)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 10/29/2020, #2 Exhibit A-Brands Archive, #3 Exhibit B-'702 patent, #4 Exhibit C-Nelson assignment 16694487, #5 Exhibit D-'217 patent, #6 Exhibit E-Nelson assignment 16694479, #7 Exhibit F- '702 claim chart, #8 Exhibit G-'217 claim chart) (JDH)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DANZE, INC, GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC, GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. (REO)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases, filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Swift on behalf of Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6250710) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Brands Archive, #2 Exhibit B-'702 patent, #3 Exhibit C-Nelson assignment 16694487, #4 Exhibit D-'217 patent, #5 Exhibit E-Nelson assignment 16694479, #6 Exhibit F- '702 claim chart, #7 Exhibit G-'217 claim chart, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Swift, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY v. GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERBER PLUMBING FIXTURES LLC
Represented By: David J. Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANZE, INC
Represented By: David J. Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Union Industrial Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Represented By: Michael Patrick Kella
Represented By: Michael P. Doerr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dowdy
Represented By: David P. Utykanski
Represented By: George D. Moustakas
Represented By: Jewell Nile Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?