NOEL v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Plaintiff: JAMES F. NOEL, JR.
Defendant: MYLA A. ELDRIDGE, FRANKLIN D. WOOTEN, MARION COUNTY, MICHELLE SHARPE, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, JEREMY JOHNSON, STATE OF INDIANA, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA, KENNETH C. GREER, JOHN GREEN and CHIRIS HILL
Case Number: 1:2020cv03245
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice, filed by Plaintiff JAMES F. NOEL, JR. (MAC)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Dkt. #2 is granted to the extent that Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Eighteen Dollars and Fourteen Cents ($18.14). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff shall have forty (40) days from the entry of this Order in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. However, Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for the reasons set forth above. This dismissal is without prejudice, meaning that Plaintiff may file a new complaint that complies with the rulings in this Order. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, it must be filed within forty days (40) from the date of this Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel Dkt. #3 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/7/2021. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff JAMES F. NOEL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JAMES F. NOEL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Affidavit of Indigency and History, #2 Envelope)(REO)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA, MYLA A. ELDRIDGE, JOHN GREEN, KENNETH C. GREER, CHIRIS HILL, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, JEREMY JOHNSON, MARION COUNTY, MICHELLE SHARPE, STATE OF INDIANA, FRANKLIN D. WOOTEN, filed by JAMES F. NOEL, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOEL v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLA A. ELDRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKLIN D. WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE SHARPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH C. GREER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIRIS HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES F. NOEL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?