JACKSON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: DAVID L. JACKSON
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2020cv06219
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Remark - Case Transferred In from Middle District of Alabama, Cause No. 2:20-cv-605 on 9/8/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6218-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Colorado, Cause No. 1:20-cv-1663 on 9/11/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6219-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Colorado, Cause No. 1:20-cv-2578 on 9/11/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6220-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 8:20-cv-2466 on 9/9/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6221-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Massachusetts, Cause No. 1:20-cv-11521 on 9/11/2020,assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6222-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Nevada, Cause No. 2:20-cv-1024 on 9/9/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6223-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Ohio, Cause No. 1:20-cv-638 on 9/9/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6224-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Texas, Cause No. 3:20-cv-2519 on 9/9/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6225-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06218-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06219-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06220-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06221-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06222-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06223-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06224-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06225-RLY-TAB(LBT)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/11/2020.(LBT)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:20-cv-01663. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-101) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-01663 KMT, to The Southern District of Indiana, to become part of MDL 2570, by Clerk on 9/10/2020. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 9/11/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Potential Tag Along by Plaintiff David L. Jackson (Kreis, Douglass) [Transferred from Colorado on 9/11/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: No later than 9/8/2020, Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding service of the defendants and whether a scheduling conference or other proceedings should be set. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/25/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 9/11/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 9/11/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 9/11/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe ApS (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7331451)Attorney Douglass Alan Kreis added to party David L. Jackson(pty:pla), filed by David L. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreis, Douglass) [Transferred from Colorado on 9/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID L. JACKSON
Represented By: Douglass A. Kreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?