HAYSLIP v. COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN HAYSLIP
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS and COOK INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2020cv06237
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 Remark - Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 2:20-cv-11537 on 10/5/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6237-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 4:20-cv-12443 on 10/7/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6238-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of South Carolina, Cause No. 2:20-cv-3203 on 10/5/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6239-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Texas, Cause No. 7:20-cv-245 on 10/5/2020,assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6240-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06237-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06238-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06239-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06240(LBT)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/7/2020.(LBT)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-11537. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Transfer to the Southern District of Indiana for MDL 2750 (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-107) to Southern District of Indiana for MDL # 2570. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-107) for MDL # 2570. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe ApS* (SKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe ApS* (SKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Satisfying #3 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Stephen Hayslip re #3 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Stephen Hayslip against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Ben C. Martin to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2020. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
June 12, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe ApS* (SKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stephen Hayslip against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7858953 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County, Michigan - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County, Michigan - County of 1st Defendant: Marion County. Indiana. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC Southern District of Indiana, 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, Judge Honorable Richard L. Young] (Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAYSLIP v. COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN HAYSLIP
Represented By: Ben C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?