W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY v. JARMAN et al
Plaintiff: W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY d/b/a WATCH COMMUNICATIONS and W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY doing business as WATCH COMMUNICATIONS
Defendant: TODD MOSBY, ROGER CRIBLEZ and TOM KOLB
3Rd Party Plaintiff: GREG JARMAN and GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Chris Daniels
Counter Defendant: W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00550
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Answer in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Answer) (JRB) Modified on 5/3/2021 (JRB). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/3/2021) (JRB).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2021 04:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before May 13, 2021. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/30/2021.(SWM)
April 28, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Counts IV and V), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Chris Daniels, COUNTERCLAIM against W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY, filed by GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC, GREG JARMAN.(Brewer, Wendy)
April 28, 2021 Filing 28 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I, VII and VIII) , filed by Defendant GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 28, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I, VII and VIII), filed by Defendant GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 28, 2021 Filing 26 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-IV and VII-VIII) AND MOTION TO STRIKE IRRELEVANT ALLEGATIONS , filed by Defendant GREG JARMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jarman Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Jarman Agreement)(Brewer, Wendy)
April 28, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-IV and VII-VIII) AND MOTION TO STRIKE IRRELEVANT ALLEGATIONS, filed by Defendant GREG JARMAN. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Defendants' #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 4/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/26/2021. (SWM)
April 21, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to April 28, 2021 to Response to Complaint, filed by Defendants GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC, GREG JARMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brewer, Wendy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I and V-VIII of the Complaint) , filed by Defendant TODD MOSBY. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I and V-VIII of the Complaint), filed by Defendant TODD MOSBY. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 21 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-II and V-VIII of the Complaint) , filed by Defendant TOM KOLB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kolb Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Kolb Affidavit)(Brewer, Wendy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-II and V-VIII of the Complaint), filed by Defendant TOM KOLB. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 19 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-II and V-VIII of the Complaint) , filed by Defendant ROGER CRIBLEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Criblez Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Criblez Agreement)(Brewer, Wendy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-II and V-VIII of the Complaint), filed by Defendant ROGER CRIBLEZ. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M. Brymer on behalf of Defendants ROGER CRIBLEZ, GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC, GREG JARMAN, TOM KOLB, TODD MOSBY. (Brymer, Laura)
April 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants ROGER CRIBLEZ, GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC, GREG JARMAN, TOM KOLB, TODD MOSBY. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendants ROGER CRIBLEZ, GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC, GREG JARMAN, TOM KOLB, TODD MOSBY. (Brewer, Wendy)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Marie Gilbert-Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. (Gilbert-Johnson, Ashley)
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service, filed by W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC served on 3/23/2021. (Guin, Rachel)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service, filed by W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. TODD MOSBY served on 3/17/2021. (Guin, Rachel)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service, filed by W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. TOM KOLB served on 3/17/2021. (Guin, Rachel)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. ROGER CRIBLEZ served on 3/17/2021. (Guin, Rachel)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. GREG JARMAN served on 3/17/2021. (Guin, Rachel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Paul Simmons on behalf of Plaintiff W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. (Simmons, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ROGER CRIBLEZ, GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC, GREG JARMAN, TOM KOLB, TODD MOSBY. (AAS)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. (Guin, Rachel)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel J. Guin on behalf of Plaintiff W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. (Guin, Rachel)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6447645) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Greg Jarman, #3 Proposed Summons Roger Criblez, #4 Proposed Summons Tom Kolb, #5 Proposed Summons Todd Mosby, #6 Proposed Summons Grit Technologies LLC)(Guin, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY v. JARMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY d/b/a WATCH COMMUNICATIONS
Represented By: Rachel J. Guin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY doing business as WATCH COMMUNICATIONS
Represented By: Rachel J. Guin
Represented By: Andrew Paul Simmons
Represented By: Ashley Marie Gilbert-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD MOSBY
Represented By: Laura M. Brymer
Represented By: Wendy D. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER CRIBLEZ
Represented By: Laura M. Brymer
Represented By: Wendy D. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM KOLB
Represented By: Laura M. Brymer
Represented By: Wendy D. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: GREG JARMAN
Represented By: Laura M. Brymer
Represented By: Wendy D. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: GRIT TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Laura M. Brymer
Represented By: Wendy D. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chris Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: W.A.T.C.H TV COMPANY
Represented By: Rachel J. Guin
Represented By: Andrew Paul Simmons
Represented By: Ashley Marie Gilbert-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?