HORTON v. VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD C. HORTON
Defendant: PATRICK PEMBERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS, RAMONDA PEMERTON and RAMONDA PEMBERTON
Case Number: 1:2021cv00616
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION Default Hearing, filed by Plaintiff EDWARD C. HORTON. (JDC)
May 3, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hearing or Ruling, filed by Defendants PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMBERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS. (Zimmerly, Philip)
April 20, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Judgment Hearing or Ruling, filed by Plaintiff EDWARD C. HORTON. (JDC)
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend page 1 of Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Answer, filed by Plaintiff EDWARD C. HORTON. (JDC)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(B)(6)) , filed by Defendants PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMBERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS. (Zimmerly, Philip)
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Defendant's Answer, filed by Plaintiff EDWARD C. HORTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24)(JDC)
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to "Ex Parte", filed by Defendants PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMBERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS. (Zimmerly, Philip)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION For Possession of Motorcycle Filed with Complaint, filed by Defendants PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMBERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS. (Zimmerly, Philip)
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, filed by Plaintiff EDWARD C. HORTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13)(JDC)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(B)(6)) , filed by Defendants PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMBERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS. (Zimmerly, Philip)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(B)(6)), filed by Defendants PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMBERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS. (Zimmerly, Philip)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS. (Zimmerly, Philip)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Zimmerly on behalf of Defendants PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMBERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS. (Zimmerly, Philip)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Over Plaintiff's objection, Defendant Ramonda Pemberton's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 6) is granted and Ms. Pemberton is granted an extension of time through May 7, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The Clerk issued the summons on March 15, 2021. Assuming Ms. Pemberton received the summons on that same date, which is extremely unlikely, the earliest possible date on which an answer or other response would be due is April 6, 2021. With time for mailing, the deadline is likely a few days later. An answer or other response is due 21 days after service of the summons, not counting the date of service. So Ms. Pemberton is not in default and her motion for an extension of time was timely filed. The Clerk is directed to correct the spelling of Ms. Pemberton's name on the docket. (Copies to Parties via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 4/5/2021.
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to, filed by Plaintiff EDWARD C. HORTON. (JDC)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant RAMONDA PEMBERTON. (JDC) Modified on 4/6/2021 (JDC).
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by EDWARD C. HORTON. (JDC)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMERTON. (REO)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Possession on Motorcycle, filed by Plaintiff EDWARD C. HORTON. (REO)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PATRICK PEMBERTON, RAMONDA PEMERTON, VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS, filed by EDWARD C. HORTON. (Filing fee $402, receipt number IP073068) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Work order)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HORTON v. VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK PEMBERTON
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VILLAGE SCOOTERS AND POWERSPORTS
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMONDA PEMERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMONDA PEMBERTON
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD C. HORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?