HILL v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: PAUL R. HILL
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS and COOK MEDICAL LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00676
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
3 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:21-cv-00674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00676-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00680-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00681-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00683-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 4/22/2021. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00676-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00680-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00681-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-00683-RLY-TAB (LBT)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/22/2021.(LBT)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-00676-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of Plaintiff PAUL R. HILL. (Stoller, Paul)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by PAUL R. HILL. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6467151) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stoller, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL R. HILL
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?