HARTHORNE v. HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.
Plaintiff: CANDICE HARTHORNE
Defendant: HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. N/K/A KITTLE PROPERTY GROUP, INC. and HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00691
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CLOSED DISMISSED - Plaintiff, Candice Harthorne, and Defendant, Herman & Kittle Properties, Inc. n/k/a Kittle Property Group, Inc., having filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims asserted by Plaintiff Candice Harthorne in this matter are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear her/its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/14/2022. (MAC)
February 7, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) with Prejudice, as to Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC., Plaintiff CANDICE HARTHORNE, filed by HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Craig)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared in person and by counsel for a settlement conference on November 4, 2021. A settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED.Within forty-five (45) days of the date of this entry, the parties shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Additional time to complete the execution of the settlement documents may be granted for good cause shown, if requested in writing before expiration of this period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Defendant's #28 Motion to Allow Associate General Counsel to Appear at November 4, 2021 Settlement Conference. The Defendant's Associate General Counsel may appear in-person at the November 4, 2021 settlement conference as Defendant's authorized representative. The representative must have full settlement authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/2/2021. (SWM)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Acknowledges NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ; The Appearance of Cheyna Galloway is hereby substituted for the Appearance for Michael C. Mohler. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/1/2021. (marginal Notation)(CKM)
October 29, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Allow Associate General Counsel to Appear at November 4, 2021 Settlement Conference, filed by Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Craig)
October 26, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Substitution of Appearance by Cheyna Galloway replacing Michael C. Mohler on behalf of HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. (Galloway, Cheyna)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 UNIFORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #25 APPROVED AND SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/13/2021.(SWM)
October 8, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Uniform Stipulated Protective Order)(Wiley, Craig)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Status Conference on September 16, 2021. The parties discussed the status of and future plans for discovery. The parties also discussed the in-person Settlement Conference scheduled for November 4, 2021. The parties reported that they are ready to proceed in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Defendant's Motion to Permit Insurance Representative to Appear at Settlement Conference Telephonically, Dkt. [ #21 ]. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS said Motion. The Defendant's insurance representative may attend the November 4, 2021 settlement conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/13/2021. (SWM)
September 10, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to permit a representative of its insurance carrier to appear telephonically, filed by Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for ins. rep. to appear telephonically)(Wiley, Craig)
August 2, 2021 Filing 20 Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
August 2, 2021 Filing 19 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
July 30, 2021 Filing 18 Witness List , Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff CANDICE HARTHORNE, Exhibit List , Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff CANDICE HARTHORNE. (Masur, James)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2022 02:00 PM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2022 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. (CKM)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/24/2021.(SWM)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/24/2021.(SWM)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2022. Discovery due by 12/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/24/2021.(SWM)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on May 19, 2021. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on September 16, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. This matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on November 4, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. . (Wiley, Craig)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC..(Wiley, Craig)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2021 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/3/2021.(SWM)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 Submission of State Court Records Marion County 49D2102-PL007029 (CKM)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal Ex. 1 - State Court Record by HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. N/K/A KITTLE PROPERTY GROUP, INC.. (Mohler, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re, filed by Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. N/K/A KITTLE PROPERTY GROUP, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. N/K/A KITTLE PROPERTY GROUP, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Wiley on behalf of Defendant HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. N/K/A KITTLE PROPERTY GROUP, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, case number 49D06-2102-PL-007029, filed by HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. N/K/A KITTLE PROPERTY GROUP, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6469863) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wiley, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARTHORNE v. HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDICE HARTHORNE
Represented By: James D. Masur, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC. N/K/A KITTLE PROPERTY GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Craig W. Wiley
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERMAN & KITTLE PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Craig W. Wiley
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Represented By: Cheyna Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?