AVX CORPORATION v. EBERHART
Plaintiff: AVX Corporation
Defendant: Richard A Eberhart and RICHARD A. EBERHART
Case Number: 1:2021cv00694
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Candace A. Bankovich withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/6/2021. (SWM)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Parties' #27 Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines and Set Telephonic Status Conference - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all deadlines be stayed, and this case is set for a telephone status conference on June 18, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/5/2021.(SWM)
May 5, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Defendant RICHARD A. EBERHART. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bankovich, Candace)
May 5, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle P. Kilies on behalf of Defendant RICHARD A. EBERHART. (Kilies, Janelle)
May 4, 2021 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Set Telephonic Status Conference, filed by Defendant RICHARD A. EBERHART. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bankovich, Candace)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Entry from Status Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for a status conference on April 6, 2021, with the magistrate judge. The conference was held and concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to maintain the documents at Dkts. 4, 4-1, and 4-2 under SEAL. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/1/2021. (SWM)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER (Consent Temporary Restraining Order) re #21 Notice (Other) filed by AVX CORPORATION. This Order will remain in effect until the Court rules on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. (See Order for details and further instructions and discovery deadlines). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/29/2021. (MAC)
March 26, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Richard A. Eberhart on March 23, 2021, filed by AVX CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kelley, Daniel)
March 26, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE Regarding Agreement on Consent Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff AVX CORPORATION, re #20 Status ConferenceSet Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Consent Temporary Restraining Order) (Kelley, Daniel)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Entry and Order from Status Conference - The plaintiff, by counsel, and the defendant, in person, appeared for a status conference on March 25, 2021, with the magistrate judge. The plaintiff is directed to advise the court by March 26, 2021, whether a TRO hearing will be necessary. The plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery (Dkt. 17) is granted, except that responses, by agreement, are due in 15 days. The defendant's response to the motion for preliminary injunction is due by May 5, 2021; the plaintiff's reply is due by May 12, 2021. This case is set for a telephone status conference on April 6, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
March 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Neal Bowling on behalf of Defendant RICHARD A. EBERHART. (Bowling, Joseph)
March 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace A. Bankovich on behalf of Defendant RICHARD A. EBERHART. (Bankovich, Candace)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Expedited Discovery, filed by Plaintiff AVX CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, Daniel)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 APPENDIX of Exhibits to Motion for Expedited Discovery by AVX CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Deposition)(Kelley, Daniel)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/25/2021 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Counsel and any unrepresented parties shall attend the conference by calling 877-402-9753, access code 4693226. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to email this order and all other filings made in this case to the defendant. Copy to Defendant US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/23/2021.(SWM)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michael Hurley on behalf of Plaintiff AVX CORPORATION. (Hurley, Ryan)
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy Lynn Osborn on behalf of Plaintiff AVX CORPORATION. (Osborn, Kathy)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Regarding Email Notification of Defendant, filed by Plaintiff AVX CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email notification) (Kelley, Daniel)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Kelley on behalf of Plaintiff AVX CORPORATION. (Kelley, Daniel)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to RICHARD A. EBERHART. (AKH)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO MAINTAIN FILINGS UNDER SEAL, filed by Plaintiff AVX Corporation. (Kelley, Daniel)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff AVX Corporation. (Kelley, Daniel)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 APPENDIX re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted))(Kelley, Daniel)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 *** SEALED PER DKT. #24 *** SEALED Exhibits, re #3 Motion for TRO, filed by Plaintiff AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Sealed), #2 Exhibit B (Sealed))(Kelley, Daniel) Modified on 4/2/2021 (SWM).
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, Daniel)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AVX Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Kyocera Corporation for AVX Corporation.. (Kelley, Daniel)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard A Eberhart, filed by AVX Corporation. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6470254) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sept. 22, 2015 Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Confidentiality Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Habig Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Schenkel Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - McDonagh Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Customer contact, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Kelley, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVX CORPORATION v. EBERHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Eberhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A. EBERHART
Represented By: Janelle P. Kilies
Represented By: Candace A. Bankovich
Represented By: Joseph Neal Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVX Corporation
Represented By: Daniel R. Kelley
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Lynn Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?