DOE v. TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY INDIANAPOLIS, THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY, INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS and TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00973
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Response to Discovery Request to 30 days after the Court's order on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/28/2021. (JRB)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Response to Discovery Request, filed by Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to File Responsive Pleading and Response to Discovery Request)(Morical, Alice)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Maintain Document #25 Under Seal - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/27/2021. (JRB) Modified on 5/27/2021 (JRB).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION TO CONVERT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION -filed as a Separate Entry per Order #34 , filed by Plaintiff JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DECLARATION OF JOE DOE with Exhibits)(Goodman, Ian)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw Document #32 - IT IS ORDERED that Document #32 is WITHDRAWN. Plaintiff shall #11 , attached to his motion, as a separate entry in this case within five (5) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/21/2021. (JRB)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #32 Reply in Support of Motion AND REPLACE DOC. 32, filed by Plaintiff JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #2 Exhibit Reply's Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodman, Ian)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY 973 *** REPLY in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION TO CONVERT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION , filed by Plaintiff JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DECLARATION OF JOE DOE with Exhibits)(Goodman, Ian) Modified on 5/21/2021 (JRB).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY, re #1 Complaint. (Morical, Alice)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Manual Filing re #25 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), filed by INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 image of thumb drive) (JDC)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Morical, Alice)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 Unopposed MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #25 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Morical, Alice)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #25 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morical, Alice)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPENDIX of Unsealed Exhibits by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McLean-Johnson Affirmation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rigdon Affirmation, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dickey Affirmation, #4 Exhibit 4 - Magallon Affirmation, #5 Exhibit 5 - El Jordi Affirmation, #6 Exhibit 6 - Slip sheet, #7 Exhibit 7 - Slip sheet, #8 Exhibit 8 - Slip sheet)(Morical, Alice)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SEALED Appendix of Exhibits, filed by Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Slip sheet, #2 Exhibit Slip sheet, #3 Exhibit Slip sheet, #4 Exhibit Slip sheet, #5 Exhibit Slip sheet, #6 Exhibit CCS for Doe criminal case, #7 Exhibit Notice of manual filing, #8 Exhibit Pseudonym key)(Morical, Alice)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelee Amanda John on behalf of Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (John, Chelee)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #5 MOTION TO PROCEED USING PSEUDONYM - Plaintiff may proceed using the pseudonym "JOHN DOE". Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/27/2021. (AAS)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 4/26/2021. Parties were represented by counsel. No further orders are entered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Convert Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #11 to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' Response in Opposition to the Motion for PI shall be filed by May 10, 2021, and Plaintiff's Reply in Support to the Motion for PI shall be filed by May 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/27/2021. (TMB)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO CONVERT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, filed by Plaintiff JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodman, Ian)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 4/23/2021. Status Conference set for 4/26/2021 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan P. Mensz on behalf of Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Mensz, Jan)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice McKenzie Morical on behalf of Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS, TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Morical, Alice)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE on APRIL 23, 2021 at 9:30 a.m., Indianapolis time (EDT), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/22/2021.(JRB)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SEALED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER'S EXHIBITS- UNDER SEAL, filed by Plaintiff JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G)(Goodman, Ian)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B-Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C-Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D- Policy, #5 Exhibit E- IU Code of Student Rights, Responsibilities, and Conduct, #6 Exhibit F-Under Seal, #7 Exhibit G-Under Seal)(Goodman, Ian) Modified text per Entry at #21 on 4/27/2021 (TMB).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodman, Ian) Modified text per Entry at #21 on 4/27/2021 (TMB).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS. (DJH)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS. (Bont, Jonathan)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (DJH)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO PROCEED USING PSEUDONYM, filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bont, Jonathan)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian P. Goodman on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe. (Goodman, Ian)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEALED NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED USING PSEUDONUM, filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Bont, Jonathan)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Bont on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe. (Bont, Jonathan)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY INDIANAPOLIS, THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY, filed by John Doe. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6520985) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bont, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY INDIANAPOLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY - INDIANAPOLIS
Represented By: Alice McKenzie Morical
Represented By: Jan P. Mensz
Represented By: Chelee Amanda John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Alice McKenzie Morical
Represented By: Jan P. Mensz
Represented By: Chelee Amanda John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bont
Represented By: Ian P. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?