BARBOSA VASQUEZ et al v. HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DIEGO FELIPE BARBOSA VASQUEZ and ANGIEE LILIANA ROCHA PARRA
Defendant: CLAY BURNETTE, HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC and TRACEY WALKER
Case Number: 1:2021cv01012
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION to Magistrate Jurisdiction for the Purpose of Ruling on 12 (b) (3) Motion, filed by Plaintiffs DIEGO FELIPE BARBOSA VASQUEZ, ANGIEE LILIANA ROCHA PARRA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Christopher) Modified on 6/22/2021 (MRI).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, filed by Plaintiffs DIEGO FELIPE BARBOSA VASQUEZ, ANGIEE LILIANA ROCHA PARRA. (Clark, Christopher)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, John W. Richards hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Richards, John)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Ryan Matthew Heeb hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Heeb, Ryan)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC . (Heeb, Ryan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Heeb, Ryan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Heeb, Ryan)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - This case is assigned for a telephonic initial pretrial conference before United States Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on June 23, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern Time). Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. **SEE ORDER**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/4/2021.(MGG)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Richards, John)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Richards, John)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Richards on behalf of Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Richards, John)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Matthew Heeb on behalf of Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Heeb, Ryan)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CLAY BURNETTE, HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC, TRACEY WALKER. (REO)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett M. Lewis on behalf of Plaintiffs DIEGO FELIPE BARBOSA VASQUEZ, ANGIEE LILIANA ROCHA PARRA. (Lewis, Garrett)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Clark on behalf of Plaintiffs DIEGO FELIPE BARBOSA VASQUEZ, ANGIEE LILIANA ROCHA PARRA. (Clark, Christopher)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6528033) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Clark, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARBOSA VASQUEZ et al v. HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAY BURNETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Heeb
Represented By: John W. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIEGO FELIPE BARBOSA VASQUEZ
Represented By: Christopher E. Clark
Represented By: Garrett M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGIEE LILIANA ROCHA PARRA
Represented By: Christopher E. Clark
Represented By: Garrett M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?