SALCEDO v. RN STAFF INC. et al
Plaintiff: PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO and MA. PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO
Defendant: ARVIN AMATORIO, MANUEL GARCIA, RAMON VILLEGAS, RN STAFF INC. and ANTONINA HASKINS
Case Number: 1:2021cv01161
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants MANUEL GARCIA, ANTONINA HASKINS, RN STAFF INC., RAMON VILLEGAS. (McCarney, Patrick)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Stephen McCarney on behalf of Defendants MANUEL GARCIA, ANTONINA HASKINS, RN STAFF INC., RAMON VILLEGAS. (McCarney, Patrick)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce H. Bennett, Jr on behalf of Defendants MANUEL GARCIA, ANTONINA HASKINS, RN STAFF INC., RAMON VILLEGAS. (Bennett, Bryce)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by MA. PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO. RN STAFF INC. served on 6/1/2021. (CKM)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by MA. PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO. RAMON VILLEGAS served on 6/1/2021. (CKM)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by MA. PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO. MANUEL GARCIA served on 6/1/2021. (CKM)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by MA. PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO. MANUEL GARCIA served on 6/1/2021. (CKM) Modified on 6/8/2021 (CKM).
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by MA. PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO. ANTONINA HASKINS served on 6/1/2021. (CKM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ARVIN AMATORIO, MANUEL GARCIA, ANTONINA HASKINS, RN STAFF INC., RAMON VILLEGAS. Copies Mailed to Plaintiff Via U.S. Mail (CKM)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 RECEIPT #IP073910 for filing fee in the amount of $402.00, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARVIN AMATORIO, MANUEL GARCIA, ANTONINA HASKINS, RN STAFF INC., and RAMON VILLEGAS, filed by PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALCEDO v. RN STAFF INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARVIN AMATORIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANUEL GARCIA
Represented By: Bryce H. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Stephen McCarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMON VILLEGAS
Represented By: Bryce H. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Stephen McCarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN STAFF INC.
Represented By: Bryce H. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Stephen McCarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONINA HASKINS
Represented By: Bryce H. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Stephen McCarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MA. PATROCINIO F. SALCEDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?