NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. v. AMI STORES MANAGEMENT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.
Defendant: AMI 63 LLC D/B/A AMI 63 FOOD MART, AMI STORES MANAGEMENT, INC., AMI 57 LLC D/B/A AMI 70 FOOD MART, AMI 57 LLC doing business as AMI 70 FOOD MART and AMI 63 LLC doing business as AMI 63 FOOD MART
Counter Claimant: AMI 57 LLC and AMI 63 LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01539
Filed: June 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines: Settlement Conference set for 11/10/2021 09:00 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Three business days before the scheduled conference, the parties shall submit (not file) to the Magistrate Judge a confidential settlement statement. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/4/2021.(SWM)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel on 8/3/2021, for a Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 2/5/2022. Discovery due by 1/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/4/2021.(SWM)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Parties First Extension of Time to Respond to #8 Counterclaim and Third Party Claim, filed by Counter Defendant NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Meyer, Jaime) Modified on 7/27/2021 (JRB).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting AMI Parties' #10 Motion for Continuance - Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 8/3/2021 02:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. All requirements in the order originally setting this conference shall remain in effect. [Filing No. #7 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/14/2021.(SWM)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Counter Defendant NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC., Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. . (Roberts, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Continuance of Telephonic Initial Pre-Trial Conference, filed by Counter Claimants AMI 57 LLC, AMI 63 LLC, AMI STORES MANAGEMENT, INC., Defendants AMI 57 LLC, AMI 63 LLC, AMI STORES MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pinaud, Donald)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Answer in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Answer) (JRB)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM AND JOINDER CLAIM against NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC., filed by All Defendants.(Pinaud, Donald)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - This case is assigned for a telephonic initial pretrial conference before United States Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on July 19, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern Time). Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. **SEE ORDER**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/29/2021. (MGG)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 RECEIPT #IP074382 for pro hac vice fee in the amount of $100.00, paid by attorney Donald Pinaud for #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (DJH)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIPT #IP074382 for filing fee in the amount of $402.00, paid by Donald Pinaud on behalf of Defendants. (DJH)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
June 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald E. Pinaud, Jr. to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LMK)
June 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Circuit Court, case number 49D04-2105-CT-015769, filed by NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1- to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2- to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 3- to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit 4- to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 5- to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit B- to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit C- to Notice of Removal)(LMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. v. AMI STORES MANAGEMENT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMI 63 LLC D/B/A AMI 63 FOOD MART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMI STORES MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Donald E. Pinaud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMI 57 LLC D/B/A AMI 70 FOOD MART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMI 57 LLC doing business as AMI 70 FOOD MART
Represented By: Donald E. Pinaud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMI 63 LLC doing business as AMI 63 FOOD MART
Represented By: Donald E. Pinaud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.
Represented By: Donald E. Pinaud, Jr.
Represented By: Jaime L. Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AMI 57 LLC
Represented By: Donald E. Pinaud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AMI 63 LLC
Represented By: Donald E. Pinaud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?