NEEDLER v. EADS ROOFING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE NEEDLER
Defendant: PRESIDENT CLAYTON EADS and EADS ROOFING, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01752
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Mario Garcia
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MARGINAL ENTRY re [ #15 ] Response to 8/9/2021, Show Cause Order - The show cause order [Filing No. #14 ] is discharged provided, however, Defendants may file a petition seeking attorneys' fees and costs needlessly incurred as a result of Plaintiff's counsel's failure to appear at the August 4, 2021, initial pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/10/2021.(SWM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE , re #14 Order: Case ManagementOrder to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff CHRISTINE NEEDLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: July 6 2021 Emails to/from Court, #2 Exhibit B: July 9 email to Martin & Response, #3 Exhibit C: July 16 email to Martin, #4 Exhibit D: Police Report)(Meisenhelder, Jay)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Counsel for Defendants appeared on 8/4/2021, for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appeared. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2022. Discovery due by 4/15/2021. Status Conference set for 2/16/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Plaintiff's counsel shall show cause by August 18, 2021, why sanctions should not issue for his failure to appear for the 8/4/2021 initial pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/9/2021.(SWM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants CLAYTON EADS, EADS ROOFING, LLC . (Taft, Melissa)
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendants' Answer to Complaint and Jury Trial Demand and Defenses, filed by CLAYTON EADS, EADS ROOFING, LLC.(Taft, Melissa)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - The Court, on its own motion, resets the August 17, 2021, telephonic initial pretrial conference to be held in person before United States Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on August 4, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. in Room 234, Birch Bayh Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. **SEE ORDER**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/13/2021.(MGG)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-1752-TWP-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Baker. The parties should use the above cause number (1:21-cv-01752-TWP-TAB) in all future filings in this matter. All case schedules and deadlines before the District Judge and Magistrate Judge remain unchanged at this time, including hearing, conference, and trial dates. In the event that any calendared dates must be vacated and reassigned, the parties will receive notice by separate order. (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/7/2021. (AKH)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on TUESDAY, AUGUST 17, 2021 at 2:30 p.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Mario Garcia, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 6/16/2021.(JDC)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 Submission of State Court Record from Marion Superior Court in case number 49D12-2104-CC-014280, filed by Plaintiff CHRISTINE NEEDLER. (AKH)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Ann Van Pelt on behalf of Defendants CLAYTON EADS, EADS ROOFING, LLC. (Van Pelt, Megan)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants CLAYTON EADS, EADS ROOFING, LLC. (Taft, Melissa)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLAYTON EADS, EADS ROOFING, LLC. (Taft, Melissa)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa K. Taft on behalf of Defendants CLAYTON EADS, EADS ROOFING, LLC. (Taft, Melissa)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court 12, case number 49D12-2104-CC-014280, filed by CLAYTON EADS, EADS ROOFING, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6612642) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - All State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taft, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEEDLER v. EADS ROOFING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE NEEDLER
Represented By: Jay Meisenhelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESIDENT CLAYTON EADS
Represented By: Megan Ann Van Pelt
Represented By: Melissa K. Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EADS ROOFING, LLC
Represented By: Megan Ann Van Pelt
Represented By: Melissa K. Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?