ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS et al v. ROKITA et al
Plaintiff: ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, MARTINSVILLE CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION, AVON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, G. RANDALL HARRISON, SUZANNE LEBO and SHANNON ADAMS
Defendant: TAMMY MEYER, TODD ROKITA and KATIE JENNER
Case Number: 1:2021cv01767
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER. (Earls, Kelly)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Earls, Kelly) Modified on 8/4/2021 (CKM).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Defendant Todd Rokita's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Statement of Affirmative Defenses, filed by TODD ROKITA.(Earls, Kelly)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER, TODD ROKITA, re #1 Complaint. (Earls, Kelly) Modified on 7/6/2021 (CKM).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Court orders as follows: 1) Defendant Todd Rokita, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Indiana, and his respective agents, officers, employees, and successors, and all persons acting in concert with him or under his direction or control are hereby PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED from implementing, enforcing, administering, invoking, or giving any effect to Indiana Code 20-29-5-6(c)-(d) as applied to existing dues deduction withholding agreements at issue in this litigation until after the 26th pay period of the 2020-2021 school year; and 2) Defendant Todd Rokita, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Indiana, and his respective agents, officers, employees, and successors, and all persons acting in concert with him or under his direction or control are hereby also PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED from enforcing Indiana Code 20-29-5-6(c)(3) as to all new dues withholding authorization forms at issue in this litigation until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/30/2021.(LDH)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons detailed above, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' Contract Clause and First Amendment free speech claims and DENIED as to Plaintiffs' First Amendment freedom of association claim. Accordingly, the State is preliminarily enjoined from enforcing SEA 251 to terminate existing dues deduction withholding agreements until after the 26th pay period of the 2020-2021 school year. The State is also enjoined from enforcing Indiana Code 20-29-5-6(c)(3) as to all new dues withholding authorization forms until further order of the Court. The specific language of the injunction will be set forth in a separate order as required by the Seventh Circuit. (See Order for Details.) Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/30/2021. (LDH)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute Entry for oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. 2] before Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/29/2021. Plaintiffs' counsel presented their oral arguments. Defense counsel presented their oral arguments. The Court takes the matter under advisement. Court is adjourned. (Court Reporter Laura Howie-Walters.) (LDH)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing of Withdrawal Authorization Form by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Withdrawal Authorization) (Macey, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/1/2021 (CKM).
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY in Support of Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs SHANNON ADAMS, ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AVON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, G. RANDALL HARRISON, SUZANNE LEBO, MARTINSVILLE CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION. (Macey, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Entry and Order from Status Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for a status conference on June 25, 2021, with the magistrate judge. The conference was held and concluded without further order. Oral argument on the motion for preliminary injunction is set by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: This cause is set for oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral Argument is set for 6/29/2021 10:15 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. (CKM)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Defendants KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER, TODD ROKITA. (Earls, Kelly)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith McCutcheon on behalf of Defendants KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER, TODD ROKITA. (McCutcheon, Meredith)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Lyn Abshire on behalf of Defendants KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER, TODD ROKITA. (Abshire, Courtney)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Ann Hurdle Shields on behalf of Defendants KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER, TODD ROKITA. (Hurdle Shields, Sarah)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Entry from Status Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for a status conference on June 17, 2021, with the magistrate judge. The plaintiffs' motion for expedited briefing (Dkt. #6 ) is granted as follows. Defendants shall file their response to the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction by June 24, 2021. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due June 28, 2021. This case is set for a telephone status conference on June 25, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (AKW)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/17/2021 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling 877-402-9753, access code 4693226. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/17/2021.(SWM)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Earls on behalf of Defendants KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER, TODD ROKITA. (Earls, Kelly)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to KATIE JENNER, TAMMY MEYER, TODD ROKITA. (LMK)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule, filed by Plaintiffs SHANNON ADAMS, ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AVON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, G. RANDALL HARRISON, SUZANNE LEBO, MARTINSVILLE CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macey, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A. Macey on behalf of Plaintiffs SHANNON ADAMS, ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AVON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, G. RANDALL HARRISON, SUZANNE LEBO, MARTINSVILLE CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION. (Macey, Barry)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Macey on behalf of Plaintiffs SHANNON ADAMS, ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AVON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, G. RANDALL HARRISON, SUZANNE LEBO, MARTINSVILLE CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION. (Macey, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs SHANNON ADAMS, ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AVON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, G. RANDALL HARRISON, SUZANNE LEBO, MARTINSVILLE CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION. (Macey, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs SHANNON ADAMS, ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AVON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, G. RANDALL HARRISON, SUZANNE LEBO, MARTINSVILLE CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Declaration of Shannon Adams, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1A: Martinsville CBA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1B: Martinsville Dues Authorization Forms, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Declaration of Suzanne Lebo, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2A: Avon CBA, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2B: Avon Dues Deduction Authorization, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Declaration of G. Randall Harrison, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 3A: Anderson CBA, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 3B: Anderson Dues Authorization)(Macey, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6613065) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Macey, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS et al v. ROKITA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDERSON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Macey
Represented By: Barry A. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTINSVILLE CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Macey
Represented By: Barry A. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVON FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Macey
Represented By: Barry A. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. RANDALL HARRISON
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Macey
Represented By: Barry A. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE LEBO
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Macey
Represented By: Barry A. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON ADAMS
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Macey
Represented By: Barry A. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY MEYER
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Kelly Earls
Represented By: Meredith McCutcheon
Represented By: Sarah Ann Hurdle Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD ROKITA
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Kelly Earls
Represented By: Meredith McCutcheon
Represented By: Sarah Ann Hurdle Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATIE JENNER
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Kelly Earls
Represented By: Meredith McCutcheon
Represented By: Sarah Ann Hurdle Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?