HINER et al v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Plaintiff: ROB OGDEN, HARLEY HINER, MIKE ADAMS and JENNIFER SWAFFORD
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01780
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiffs MIKE ADAMS, HARLEY HINER, ROB OGDEN, JENNIFER SWAFFORD. (Ellis, Benjamin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Responding to any written request for discovery or admission, filed by Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Flint, Jaclyn)
July 21, 2021 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Flint, Jaclyn)
July 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Flint, Jaclyn)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 Statement Under Rule 81-1 by All Plaintiffs. (Ellis, Benjamin)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/13/2021.(SWM)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2022. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/12/2021.(SWM)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on July 12, 2021, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on October 18, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs MIKE ADAMS, HARLEY HINER, ROB OGDEN, JENNIFER SWAFFORD . (Ellis, Benjamin)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Flint, Jaclyn)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 Submission of State Court Record from Marion Superior Court, Case Number 49D01-2105-CT-016152. (DWH)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2021 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/21/2021.(SWM)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L. Martin on behalf of Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Martin, Bonnie)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Flint, Jaclyn)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Flint, Jaclyn)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Michelle Flint on behalf of Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Flint, Jaclyn)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce H. Bennett, Jr on behalf of Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Bennett, Bryce)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D01-2105-CT-016152, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6614614) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2/24/2021 Letter to GM, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flint, Jaclyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HINER et al v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROB OGDEN
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARLEY HINER
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE ADAMS
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER SWAFFORD
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: Bryce H. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Jaclyn Michelle Flint
Represented By: Bonnie L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?