MOLLER ENTERPRISES LLC v. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff: MOLLER ENTERPRISES LLC
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv01931
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2021. Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/27/2021.(SWM)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/27/2021. Approved Case Management Plan with parties' agreed changes to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/4/2021 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 12/7/2021 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Brett Hunter Pyrdek for JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/27/2021. (SWM)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/27/2021.(SWM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brett H. Pyrdek to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6720545), filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certification in Support of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
August 26, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff MOLLER ENTERPRISES LLC. (Goodman, Ian)
August 23, 2021 Filing 19 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION & Plaintiff Moller Enterprises LLC. (England, Annette)
August 19, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Contract, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
August 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (England, Annette)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: This is matter is before the Court on Defendant's Unopposed Motions for Extensions of Time. (Dkts. #13 & #14 .) Those motions are hereby GRANTED. On or before August 19, 2021, Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint and a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/19/2021. (GD)
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 19, 2021 in which to #9 MOTION to Remand , #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 16, 2021 in which to #9 MOTION to Remand , #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Complaint , filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
August 12, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 16, 2021 in which to #9 MOTION to Remand , #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Complaint, filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2021 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/4/2021.(SWM)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 8/12/2021. No further enlargement of this deadline is anticipated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/4/2021. (SWM)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 12, 2021 in which to #5 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Annette)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff MOLLER ENTERPRISES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Goodman, Ian)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Judge Sarah Evans Barker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-01931-JMS-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (LMK)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/16/2021. (LDH)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Updated Exhibit A)(England, Annette)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (England, Annette)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION identifying Corporate Parent JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. for JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.. (England, Annette)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Annette M. England on behalf of Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (England, Annette)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Hamilton County, Indiana, case number 29D04-2015-PL-003754, filed by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6635701) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons, Complaint, Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(England, Annette) Modified on 7/1/2021 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOLLER ENTERPRISES LLC v. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Annette M. England
Represented By: Brett Hunter Pyrdek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOLLER ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: Ian P. Goodman
Represented By: James P. Strenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?