INDIANA GAS COMPANY, INC v. OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.
Plaintiff: INDIANA GAS COMPANY, iNC. d/b/a VECTREN and INDIANA GAS COMPANY, INC. doing business as VECTREN
Defendant: OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02229
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/17/2021.(SWM)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/17/2021.(SWM)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 8/11/2021. Discovery due by 6/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/17/2021.(SWM)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on September 14, 2021. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed.This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on January 12, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system.This matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on May 3, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Debbie Pacholder for OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Debbie Pacholder via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/16/2021. (SWM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand, filed by OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P..(Vink, Paul)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Susanna Dokupil for OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Susanna Dokupil via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/15/2021. (SWM)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Steven J. Mitby for OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Steven J. Mitby via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/15/2021. (SWM)
September 14, 2021 Filing 16 Submission of Signature Requirement re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Debbie Pacholder to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6743803) by OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.. (Vink, Paul)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Debbie Pacholder to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6743803), filed by Defendant OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of D. Pacholder, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vink, Paul)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Susanna Dokupil to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6743782), filed by Defendant OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of S. Dokupil, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vink, Paul)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven J. Mitby to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6743736), filed by Defendant OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of S. Mitby, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vink, Paul)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff INDIANA GAS COMPANY, INC. . (Maley, John) Modified on 9/8/2021 (AKH).
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.. (Vink, Paul)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/16/2021.(SWM)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE (Indiana Gas Company, Inc. d/b/a Vectren's Response to Notice of Removal's Allegations Regarding Diversity Jurisdiction), filed by Plaintiff INDIANA GAS COMPANY, INC., re #1 Notice of Removal. (Maley, John)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUBMISSION of State Court Record from Marion County Superior Court in case number 49D01-2107-PL-023249. (AKH)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Curtis Greene on behalf of Plaintiff INDIANA GAS COMPANY, INC.. (Greene, Justin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Maley on behalf of Plaintiff INDIANA GAS COMPANY, INC.. (Maley, John)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.. (Vink, Paul)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Vink on behalf of Defendant OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.. (Vink, Paul)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court 1, case number 49D01-2107-PL-023249, filed by OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6697344) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket, Complaint, Summons, Appearance, Commercial Court Identifying Notice), #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vink, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDIANA GAS COMPANY, INC v. OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA GAS COMPANY, iNC. d/b/a VECTREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA GAS COMPANY, INC. doing business as VECTREN
Represented By: John R. Maley
Represented By: Justin Curtis Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWEN OIL TOOLS, L.P.
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Debbie Pacholder
Represented By: Steven J. Mitby
Represented By: Susanna Dokupil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?