JOHNSON v. TROXEL et al
Plaintiff: SHERLYNN JOHNSON
Defendant: IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER LLC and UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02303
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC, Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC. (Foos, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC. (Foos, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2022. Discovery due by 9/2/2022. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/7/2021. (GD)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/5/2021. Approved Case Management Plan with parties' agreed changes to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 7/12/2022 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/7/2021.(SWM)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC . (Foos, Robert)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MARGINAL ENTRY - regarding #12 Response to #10 Order to Show Cause. The Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/22/2021.(AKH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE , re #10 Order to Show Cause, filed by Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC. (Foos, Robert)
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement, filed by Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC (Foos, Robert)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **DISCHARGED at Dkt. #13 ** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On August 20, 2021, Defendants Ivan Troxel and UW Provision Transfer, LLC filed their Notice of Removal, removing this action to this Court from the Marion County Superior Court (Filing No. #1 ). The Notice of Removal failed to sufficiently allege the citizenship of Defendant UW Provision Transfer, LLC, so the Court issued an Entry on Jurisdiction, ordering the Defendants to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement to establish the Court's jurisdiction over the case (Filing No. #7 ). The Defendants were required to file their supplemental jurisdictional statement no later than September 6, 2021. That deadline has passed, and the Defendants have not filed a supplemental jurisdictional statement. As the party asking this Court to invoke its jurisdiction, Defendants must properly allege the citizenship of each of the parties to establish subject matter jurisdiction. Having failed to file the required supplemental jurisdictional statement, the Defendants are ORDERED to show cause by September 30, 2021, why this case should not be remanded to the Marion County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/15/2021.(AKH) Modified on 9/22/2021 (AKH).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2021 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/10/2021.(SWM)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC.(Foos, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY - It has come to the Court's attention that Defendants' Notice of Removal fails to allege all of the facts necessary to determine whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. The Notice of Removal alleges that this Court has jurisdiction based upon diversity of citizenship. However, the Notice of Removal fails to sufficiently allege the citizenship of Defendant UW Provision Transfer, LLC. Citizenship is the operative consideration for jurisdictional purposes. the Defendants are ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the citizenship of Defendant UW Provision Transfer, LLC. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/23/2021. (AKH)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UW PROVISION TRANSFER LLC. (Foos, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER LLC (Foos, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER LLC. (Foos, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendants IVAN TROXEL, UW PROVISION TRANSFER LLC. (Foos, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, case number 49D01-2107-CT-024567, filed by UW PROVISION TRANSFER LLC, IVAN TROXEL. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6711373) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, Summons, Appearance, Jury Demand, Motion for Time, Order on Motion for Time, Order on CMO, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foos, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. TROXEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERLYNN JOHNSON
Represented By: Rom Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAN TROXEL
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UW PROVISION TRANSFER LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UW PROVISION TRANSFER, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?