NEXTGEAR CAPITAL, INC. v. BIBAS
Plaintiff: NEXTGEAR CAPITAL, INC.
Defendant: MOHAMED A BIBAS and MOHAMED AHMED BIBAS
Case Number: 1:2021cv02352
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order to Withdraw Appearance by MOHAMED AHMED BIBAS (Bognanno, Nicholas)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Defendant MOHAMED AHMED BIBAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bognanno, Nicholas)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within sixty days of this date, counsel for the parties shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/8/2021.(SWM)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/22/2021 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant MOHAMED AHMED BIBAS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bognanno, Nicholas)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by George M. Plews on behalf of Defendant MOHAMED A BIBAS. (Plews, George)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Bognanno on behalf of Defendant MOHAMED A BIBAS. (Bognanno, Nicholas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Edington Connor on behalf of Defendant MOHAMED A BIBAS. (Connor, Colin)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE , filed by Defendant MOHAMED A BIBAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Plaintiff of Defendant's Notice of Removal) (Connor, Colin)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton Superior Court, case number 29D03-2107-PL-004994, filed by MOHAMED A BIBAS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6722705) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Business Entity Report, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Appearance, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEXTGEAR CAPITAL, INC. v. BIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEXTGEAR CAPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael G Gibson
Represented By: Tyler Marie Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMED A BIBAS
Represented By: Colin Edington Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMED AHMED BIBAS
Represented By: Colin Edington Connor
Represented By: George M. Plews
Represented By: Nicholas James Bognanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?