BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. GROTKOWSKI et al.
Plaintiff: BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI, Individually;, C. S. G., a minor, by Jacqueline Jeanne Grotkowski as Parent and Next Friend;, K. E. G., a minor, by Jacqueline Jeanne Grotkowski as Parent and Next Friend;, K. A. G., a minor, by Jacqueline Jeanne Grotkowski as Parent and Next Friend, JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI, C. S. G., K. E. G. and K. A. G.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02450
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 27 EXHIBIT re #25 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds, REGISTRY DEPOSIT INFORMATION FORM by BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bargher, Craig)
November 10, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 9, 2021 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants C. S. G., K. E. G., K. A. G., JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dilday, Kelsey)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - This cause coming to be heard on Plaintiff, Banner Life Insurance Company's #16 Motion for Leave to Deposit its Admitted Contractual Liability, due notice having been given and the Court being fully advised in the premises, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Banner Life's Motion is GRANTED. (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Blank Registry Deposit Information Form) (AKH)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MARGINAL ENTRY - regarding #22 Notice to Withdraw #17 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. APPROVED. Clerk is directed to show Dkt. #17 as WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/5/2021. (AKH)
November 5, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Deposit Funds BANNER LIFE INSRUANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT ITS ADMITTED CONTRACTUAL LIABILITY , filed by Defendants C. S. G., K. E. G., K. A. G., JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI. (Dilday, Kelsey)
November 4, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, filed by Plaintiff BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2361. (Bargher, Craig)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia: Status Conference held on 10/26/2021. The parties appeared by counsel for a telephonic status conference. Parties to meet and confer with one another and to exchange their legal and factual position on their outstanding dispute within 7 days. They should discuss alternatives that may exist to proceeding with this case. If they fail to resolve the dispute, they should submit a joint briefing schedule by 11/8/2021 as to the pending motion to deposit funds, motion for TRO and any other potential dispositive motion at this stage of the litigation that is expected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. (NAD)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 4:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The purpose of the conference is to discuss scheduling matters related to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Counsel are to call 888-363-4734 to participate in the conference. Callers will be required to enter Access Code 1125419 and Security Code 212450 before being connected to the conference call. Call-in information is to be used by COUNSEL ONLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/19/2021.(CBU)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #17 ). Parties are to meet with Magistrate Judge Garcia to discuss a discovery plan, briefing schedule, and to determine a date for a hearing, if necessary, as well as the estimated time required for such hearing. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/18/2021.(AKH)
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2361 BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2361, filed by Plaintiff BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bargher, Craig)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 **WITHDRAWN at DKT. #24 ** MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2361, filed by Plaintiff BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Grotkowski's Motion - Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Restraining Order)(Bargher, Craig) Modified on 11/5/2021 (AKH).
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Deposit Funds BANNER LIFE INSRUANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT ITS ADMITTED CONTRACTUAL LIABILITY, filed by Plaintiff BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Bargher, Craig)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2021 at 2:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/14/2021.(CBU)
October 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles P. Edwards on behalf of Defendants C. S. G., K. E. G., K. A. G., JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI. (Edwards, Charles)
October 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants C. S. G., K. E. G., K. A. G., JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI. (Dilday, Kelsey)
October 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Christina Dilday on behalf of Defendants C. S. G., K. E. G., K. A. G., JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI. (Dilday, Kelsey)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service, filed by BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bargher, Craig)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service, filed by BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. K. E. G. served on 9/23/2021. (Bargher, Craig)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. K. A. G. served on 9/23/2021. (Bargher, Craig)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. C. S. G. served on 9/23/2021. (Bargher, Craig)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI served on 9/23/2021. (Bargher, Craig)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to C. S. G., K. E. G., K. A. G., and JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI. (DJH)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Novotny on behalf of Plaintiff BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Novotny, David)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Bargher on behalf of Plaintiff BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bargher, Craig)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bargher, Craig)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOTR INTERPLEADER against All Defendants, filed by BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6751679) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bargher, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. GROTKOWSKI et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David J. Novotny
Represented By: Craig M. Bargher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI, Individually;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. S. G., a minor, by Jacqueline Jeanne Grotkowski as Parent and Next Friend;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. E. G., a minor, by Jacqueline Jeanne Grotkowski as Parent and Next Friend;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. A. G., a minor, by Jacqueline Jeanne Grotkowski as Parent and Next Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE JEANNE GROTKOWSKI
Represented By: Charles P. Edwards
Represented By: Kelsey Christina Dilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. S. G.
Represented By: Charles P. Edwards
Represented By: Kelsey Christina Dilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. E. G.
Represented By: Charles P. Edwards
Represented By: Kelsey Christina Dilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. A. G.
Represented By: Charles P. Edwards
Represented By: Kelsey Christina Dilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?