KAPETANIOS v. SHEPHERD et al
Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAEL KAPETANIOS, SR.
Defendant: JACKSON SHEPHERD, TONY KUMMER, ANDREW PLANK, ZACHARY M. ROMERO and CODY WOOTEN
Case Number: 1:2021cv02843
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Status on Motion for IFP, filed by Plaintiff JAMES MICHAEL KAPETANIOS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Bartholomew Co Jail Resident Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(AKH)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - This cause is before the Court on Plaintiff's motion for assistance with trust account [Filing No. #5 ]. This motion is denied. The motion fails to set forth any reason why the Court needs to issue the requested order, any legal basis for providing the relief sought, and any reason why the Court could order the jail to provide the relief requested given that neither the jail nor the sheriff is a Defendant. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/3/2021. (SWM)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 MARGINAL ENTRY re Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Assistance with Recruited Counsel - Motion denied. This appears to be a relatively straightforward case alleging excessive force by police. Plaintiff can read and write, has a GED, and has no mental or physical limitations. Plaintiff's incarceration certainly makes it more difficult for counsel to litigate and recruit counsel, but Plaintiff has not demonstrated that he cannot litigate or that he has fully exhausted his efforts to secure counsel on his own. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/2/2021. (SWM)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JAMES MICHAEL KAPETANIOS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(DWH)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Court's Assistance re Trust Account, filed by Plaintiff JAMES MICHAEL KAPETANIOS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CKM)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Assistance Recruiting Counsel, filed by Plaintiff JAMES MICHAEL KAPETANIOS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (CKM)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; Plaintiff pro se James Michael Kapetanios, Sr., a prisoner in Bartholomew County Jail in Columbus, Indiana, filed this action on November 10, 2021. [Dkt. 1]. In his complaint, Mr. Kapetanios indicated that he wishes to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915. The plaintiff shall have through December 27, 2021, in which to either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so by completing and signing the attached affidavit form and submitting a certified prison account statement for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on November 10, 2021. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/15/2021. Copy Mailed. (CKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAPETANIOS v. SHEPHERD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAEL KAPETANIOS, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON SHEPHERD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY KUMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW PLANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY M. ROMERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODY WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?