SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. et al v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Plaintiff: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. and SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02971
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #5 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal. The Clerk is directed to PERMANENTLY SEAL Docket No. 4. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/10/2022. (SWM)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jennell C Bilek for SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. and SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/14/2021. (SWM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennell C. Bilek to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6883792), filed by Plaintiffs SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bilek, Jennell)
December 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-'334 Patent). (MAC)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - This matter is before the Court upon Jennell C. Bilek's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cause only. [Dkt. 11.] The motion was electronically filed by Samuel Lockner but electronically signed by Jennell Bilek. As such, the filing violates the Court's Electronic Case Filing Policies and Procedures Manual, which provides in relevant part as follows (see Order). the motion [Dkt. 490 ] is hereby STRICKEN as improperly filed. Ms. Bilek must first comply with Local Rule 83-6(b), and then she may refile the motion using the ECF log in provided to her by the Court. Copy to Jennell C. Bile via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/10/2021. (SWM)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Samuel T. Lockner for SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD and SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/10/2021. (SWM) Modified on 12/13/2021 (SWM).
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-2971-JMS-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/8/2021. (PKP)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James Patrick Hanlon. Judge James R. Sweeney II is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-2971-JPH-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/7/2021. (BRR)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennell C. Bilek to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6872900), filed by Plaintiffs SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lockner, Samuel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel T. Lockner to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6872795), filed by Plaintiffs SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lockner, Samuel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (DJH)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Riley H. Floyd on behalf of Plaintiffs SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Floyd, Riley)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #4 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiffs SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Limrick, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #4 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiffs SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MAINTAIN DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL)(Limrick, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--'334 Patent)(Limrick, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Limrick, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Limrick on behalf of Plaintiffs SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Limrick, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6871701) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--'334 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Limrick, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. et al v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: Michael R. Limrick
Represented By: Riley H. Floyd
Represented By: Samuel T Lockner
Represented By: Jennell C Bilek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Michael R. Limrick
Represented By: Riley H. Floyd
Represented By: Samuel T Lockner
Represented By: Jennell C Bilek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?