PATTERSON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: ROSS D. PATTERSON
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED and COOK MEDICAL LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06584
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00111. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Southern District of Indiana. (CS) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. (CS) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Notified IT Department to electronically transfer case to the Southern District of Indiana. (CS) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ross D. Patterson (Shelton, David) Modified on 9/2/2021 (LDR). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ross D. Patterson (Shelton, David) Modified on 9/2/2021 (LDR). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ross D. Patterson (Shelton, David) Modified on 9/2/2021 (LDR). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ross D. Patterson (Shelton, David) Modified on 9/2/2021 (LDR). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
September 2, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to [5-8]: Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attorney is directed to refile using AO form 440 and may attach the document as an exhibit with a description. The documents should be docketed using the event Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER staying telephonic case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on August 24, 2021 (KPM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint. (LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. (LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4640552), filed by Ross D. Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 9/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSS D. PATTERSON
Represented By: David W. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?