BENSHOOF v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: GARY BENSHOOF
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06587
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1407
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by GARY BENSHOOF. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06587-RLY-TAB(Williams, Taylor)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02355-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02370-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06540-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06541-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06542-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06546-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06547-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06549-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06550-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06556-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06558-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06559-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06571-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06586-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06587-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02355-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02370-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06540-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06541-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06542-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06546-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06547-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06549-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06550-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06556-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06558-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06559-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06571-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06586-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06587-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Wright Williams on behalf of Plaintiff GARY BENSHOOF. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06587-RLY-TAB (Williams, Taylor)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GARY BENSHOOF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06587-RLY-TAB(Williams, Taylor)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 Remark - Case Transferred In from Southern District of Iowa, Cause No. 4:21-cv-250 on 9/10/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6587-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06587-RLY-TAB(LBT)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/10/2021.(LBT)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00250. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Conditional Transfer by clerk's office (CTO-161), Southern District of Indiana MDL 2570. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/10/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 MDL 2570 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-161). (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/10/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-161) Finalized on 9/8/21. Please see pleading (3 in IAS/4:21-cv-00250, 1022 in MDL No. 2570). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. Indiana for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/8/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2570, IAS/4:21-cv-00250 (JC) (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/10/2021.]
September 9, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically sent to the Southern District of Indiana. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/10/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Letter regarding Potential Tag-Along MDL case. Copy of letter, complaint and docket sheet sent to MDL panel. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/10/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/10/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4582183., filed by GARY BENSHOOF. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/23/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gruhlkey, Mandy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENSHOOF v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY BENSHOOF
Represented By: Mandy Melissa Gruhlkey
Represented By: Taylor Wright Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?