ROSS v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: LINETTE P. ROSS
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED and COOK MEDICAL LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06627
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 Remark - Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 2:21-cv-2742 on 10/21/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6627-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 2:21-cv-3132 on 10/21/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6628-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 2:21-cv-4097 on 10/20/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6629-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 2:21-cv-788 on 10/20/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6630-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Washington, Cause No. 2:21-cv-1218 on 10/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6631-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Wisconsin, Cause No. 1:21-cv-750 on 10/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6632-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06627-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06628-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06629-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06631-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06632-RLY-TAB(LBT)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/21/2021.(LBT)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02742. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 167): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Indiana for the reasons stated in the order of October 15, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
October 13, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #8 TO UNREPS ON 10/13/21. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, AND COOK MEDICAL, LLC HAS FAILED TO FILE AN ANSWER OR TO OTHERWISE PLEAD. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH THE CLERK OF COURT FOR ENTRY OF A DEFAULT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 55. IF THE REQUEST FOR FAULT IS NOT FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THIS ORDER, THE COURT WILL ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST THE ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/12/21. 10/12/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LINETTE P. ROSS re #1 Complaint (Attorney) Cook Medical, LLC (MARTIN, BENNY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LINETTE P. ROSS re #1 Complaint (Attorney) Cook Medical Incorporated (MARTIN, BENNY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LINETTE P. ROSS re #1 Complaint (Attorney) Cook Incorporated (MARTIN, BENNY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LINETTE P. ROSS re #1 Complaint (Attorney) Cook Group Incorporated (MARTIN, BENNY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Praecipe for Issuance of Alias Summons by LINETTE P. ROSS. (MARTIN, BENNY) Modified on 9/15/2021 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
September 10, 2021 ALIAS Summons Issued as to COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/10/21 (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE: A REVIEW OF THE DOCKET REVEALS THAT AT LEAST 60 DAYS HAVE PASSED SINCE PLAINTIFF FILED THE COMPLAINT, YET HAS NOT SERVED THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT. THEREFORE, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY SEPTEMBER 30, 2021, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(M). PLAINTIFF IS FURTHER ADVISED THAT FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 4(M), WITHOUT GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, WILL RESULT IN THIS ACTION BEING DISMISSED AGAINST DEFENDANTS. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/23/21 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15199497.), filed by LINETTE P. ROSS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(MARTIN, BENNY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSS v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINETTE P. ROSS
Represented By: Ben C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?